IA SF517 | 2011-2012 | 84th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on July 27 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-12-31 - END OF 2011 ACTIONS
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on July 27 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-12-31 - END OF 2011 ACTIONS
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to and making appropriations to the department of cultural affairs, the department of economic development, certain board of regents institutions, the department of workforce development, the Iowa finance authority, and the public employment relations board, and addressing related matters including tax credits and including immediate effective date and retroactive applicability provisions. (Formerly SSB 1199.) Item veto. Effective 7-27-11.
Title
A bill for an act relating to and making appropriations to the department of cultural affairs, the department of economic development, certain board of regents institutions, the department of workforce development, the Iowa finance authority, and the public employment relations board, and addressing related matters including tax credits and including immediate effective date and retroactive applicability provisions. (Formerly SSB 1199.) Item veto. Effective 7-27-11.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-12-31 | END OF 2011 ACTIONS | |
2011-07-27 | Signed by Governor. S.J. 1269. | |
2011-07-27 | Item veto. S.J. 1269. | |
2011-06-30 | Sent to Governor. S.J. 1266. | |
2011-06-30 | Reported correctly enrolled, signed by President and Speaker. S.J. 1266. | |
2011-06-27 | Message from House. S.J. 1227. | |
2011-06-27 | Immediate message. H.J. 1279. | |
2011-06-27 | Explanations of votes. H.J. 1290. | |
2011-06-27 | Passed House, ayes 52, nays 35. H.J. 1276. | |
2011-06-27 | Conference committee report adopted. H.J. 1275. | |
2011-06-24 | Message from Senate. H.J. 1265. | |
2011-06-24 | Immediate message. S.J. 1213. | |
2011-06-24 | Passed Senate, ayes 36, nays 11. S.J. 1210. | |
2011-06-24 | Conference committee report adopted. S.J. 1210. | |
2011-06-24 | Conference committee report filed. S.J. 1209. | |
2011-06-23 | Conference committee report filed. H.J. 1262. | |
2011-06-23 | Message from Senate. H.J. 1260. | |
2011-06-22 | Message from House. S.J. 1199. | |
2011-06-22 | House conference committee appointed Thomas, Jacoby, Schultz, Lofgren, and Soderberg. H.J. 1259. | |
2011-06-22 | Immediate message. S.J. 1190. | |
2011-06-22 | Senate conference committee appointed Dotzler, Boettger, Dandekar, Dvorsky, and Whitver. S.J. 1190. | |
2011-06-22 | Senate insisted. S.J. 1189. | |
2011-06-22 | Message from House. S.J. 1188. | |
2011-06-22 | Immediate message. H.J. 1257. | |
2011-06-22 | House refused to concur in Senate amendment H-1745. H.J. 1257. | |
2011-06-22 | Senate amendment H-1745 filed. H.J. 1257. | |
2011-06-22 | Message from Senate. H.J. 1255. | |
2011-06-21 | Immediate message. S.J. 1171. | |
2011-06-21 | Passed Senate, ayes 26, nays 20. S.J. 1171. | |
2011-06-21 | Senate concurred with S-3285, as amended. S.J. 1171. | |
2011-06-21 | Amendment S-3354 adopted, as amended. S.J. 1170. | |
2011-06-21 | Amendment S-3355 filed, adopted. S.J. 1169. | |
2011-06-21 | Amendment S-3354 filed. S.J. 1169. | |
2011-04-20 | Message from House, with amendment S-3285. S.J. 1038. | |
2011-04-20 | Immediate message. H.J. 1094. | |
2011-04-20 | Passed House, ayes 57, nays 42. H.J. 1092. | |
2011-04-20 | Committee amendment H-1658 as amended, adopted. H.J. 1092. | |
2011-04-20 | Amendment H-1677 lost. H.J. 1092. | |
2011-04-20 | Amendment H-1677 filed. H.J. 1091. | |
2011-04-20 | Amendment H-1672 adopted. H.J. 1091. | |
2011-04-20 | Amendment H-1671 withdrawn. H.J. 1090. | |
2011-04-20 | Motion to suspend rules failed. H.J. 1090. | |
2011-04-20 | Motion to suspend rules to consider H-1670. H.J. 1089. | |
2011-04-20 | Ruled not germane H-1670. H.J. 1089. | |
2011-04-20 | Point of order raised H-1670 not germane. H.J. 1088. | |
2011-04-20 | Amendment H-1679 adopted. H.J. 1088. | |
2011-04-20 | Amendment H-1679 filed. H.J. 1087. | |
2011-04-20 | Amendment H-1669 lost. H.J. 1087. | |
2011-04-20 | Amendment H-1678 adopted. H.J. 1086. | |
2011-04-20 | Amendment H-1678 filed. H.J. 1085. | |
2011-04-20 | Amendment H-1660 lost. H.J. 1085. | |
2011-04-20 | Asked and received unanimous consent for the immediate consideration. H.J. 1084. | |
2011-04-19 | Amendments H-1669, H-1670, H-1671, and H-1672 filed. H.J. 1082. | |
2011-04-18 | Amendment H-1660 filed. H.J. 1068. | |
2011-04-18 | Committee amendment H-1658 filed. H.J. 1068. | |
2011-04-18 | Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. H.J. 1067. | |
2011-04-18 | Subcommittee, Schultz, Chambers, Cohoon, Dolecheck, Drake, Garrett, Gaskill, Hagenow, Hall, Heaton, Heddens, Huseman, Lukan, Murphy, T. Olson, Raecker, Rogers, Running-Marquardt, Schulte, T. Taylor, Wagner, Watts, Wenthe, Winckler, and Worthan. H.J. 1066. | |
2011-04-13 | Read first time, referred to Appropriations. H.J. 1035. | |
2011-04-13 | Message from Senate. H.J. 1025. | |
2011-04-12 | Immediate message. S.J. 971. | |
2011-04-12 | Passed Senate, ayes 29, nays 21. S.J. 970. | |
2011-04-12 | Amendment S-3229 ruled out of order. S.J. 970. | |
2011-04-12 | Amendment S-3240 filed, adopted. S.J. 969. | |
2011-04-12 | Amendment S-3237 filed, adopted. S.J. 969. | |
2011-04-12 | Amendment S-3228 withdrawn. S.J. 969. | |
2011-04-12 | Amendment S-3184 withdrawn. S.J. 969. | |
2011-04-11 | Amendment S-3229 filed. S.J. 957. | |
2011-04-11 | Amendment S-3228 filed. S.J. 957. | |
2011-03-31 | Placed on calendar under unfinished business. S.J. 851. | |
2011-03-29 | Amendment S-3184 filed. S.J. 834. | |
2011-03-28 | Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 814. | |
2011-03-28 | Introduced, placed on Appropriations calendar. S.J. 813. |