IA SF516 | 2017-2018 | 87th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 12 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-12 - NOBA: Graybook
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 12 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-12 - NOBA: Graybook
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to state and local finances by making appropriations, providing for legal and regulatory responsibilities, concerning taxation, and providing for other properly related matters, and including effective date and retroactive applicability provisions. (Formerly SSB 1198.) Various effective dates; see bill.
Title
A bill for an act relating to state and local finances by making appropriations, providing for legal and regulatory responsibilities, concerning taxation, and providing for other properly related matters, and including effective date and retroactive applicability provisions. (Formerly SSB 1198.) Various effective dates; see bill.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-22 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 27 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2017-04-22 - House - Passed House (Y: 55 N: 39 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-20 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 30 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
1969-12-31 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 27 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
1969-12-31 - House - Passed House (Y: 55 N: 39 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
1969-12-31 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 30 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-22 - House - Passed House (Y: 55 N: 39 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-20 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 30 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
1969-12-31 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 27 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
1969-12-31 - House - Passed House (Y: 55 N: 39 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
1969-12-31 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 30 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-12 | House | NOBA: Graybook |
2017-05-12 | House | Signed by Governor. S.J. 1137. |
2017-05-08 | House | NOBA: Final |
2017-05-03 | House | Sent to Governor. S.J. 1134. |
2017-05-03 | House | Reported correctly enrolled, signed by President and Speaker. S.J. 1134. |
2017-04-21 | House | Message from Senate. H.J. 1140. |
2017-04-21 | Senate | Immediate message. S.J. 1124. |
2017-04-21 | Senate | Passed Senate, ayes 27, nays 13. S.J. 1123. |
2017-04-21 | Senate | Senate concurred with S-3389. S.J. 1123. |
2017-04-21 | Senate | Message from House, with amendment S-3389. S.J. 1120. |
2017-04-21 | House | Immediate message. H.J. 1139. |
2017-04-22 | House | Explanation of vote. H.J. 1146. |
2017-04-21 | House | Explanation of vote. H.J. 1142. |
2017-04-21 | House | Passed House, ayes 55, nays 39. H.J. 1139. |
2017-04-21 | House | Committee amendment H-1448 adopted, as amended. H.J. 1138. |
2017-04-21 | House | Amendment H-1452 to committee amendment H-1448 as amended filed, withdrawn. H.J. 1138. |
2017-04-21 | House | Motion to suspend rules failed. H.J. 1138. |
2017-04-22 | House | Explanation of vote. H.J. 1146. |
2017-04-21 | House | Explanation of vote. H.J. 1141. |
2017-04-21 | House | Motion to suspend rules for consideration of H-1458 to committee amendment H-1448. H.J. 1137. |
2017-04-21 | House | Point of order raised on H-1458 to committee amendment H-1448, ruled not germane. H.J. 1137. |
2017-04-21 | House | Amendment H-1458 to committee amendment H-1448 filed. H.J. 1137. |
2017-04-21 | House | Amendment H-1456 to committee amendment H-1448 filed, withdrawn. H.J. 1137. |
2017-04-21 | House | Amendment H-1453 to committee amendment H-1448 filed, withdrawn. H.J. 1136. |
2017-04-21 | House | Amendment H-1459 to committee amendment H-1448 filed, adopted. H.J. 1136. |
2017-04-20 | House | NOBA: Senate Floor |
2017-04-20 | House | Committee amendment H-1448 filed. H.J. 1117. |
2017-04-20 | House | Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. H.J. 1116. |
2017-04-20 | House | Subcommittee reassigned: Subcommittee of the Whole. H.J. 1115. |
2017-04-20 | House | Subcommittee: Grassley, Hall and Hinson. H.J. 1115. |
2017-04-20 | House | Read first time, referred to Appropriations. H.J. 1104. |
2017-04-20 | House | Message from Senate. H.J. 1103. |
2017-04-20 | Senate | Immediate message. S.J. 1105. |
2017-04-20 | Senate | Passed Senate, ayes 30, nays 20. S.J. 1104. |
2017-04-20 | Senate | Amendment S-3378 filed, withdrawn. S.J. 1104. |
2017-04-20 | Senate | Amendment S-3376 filed, withdrawn. S.J. 1104. |
2017-04-20 | Senate | Point of order raised on S-3359, ruled out of order. S.J. 1104. |
2017-04-20 | Senate | Amendment S-3362 withdrawn. S.J. 1104. |
2017-04-20 | Senate | Point of order raised on S-3361, ruled out of order. S.J. 1104. |
2017-04-20 | Senate | Amendment S-3373 filed, withdrawn. S.J. 1104. |
2017-04-20 | Senate | Amendments S-3367 and S-3381 out of order. S.J. 1103. |
2017-04-20 | Senate | Amendments S-3367 and S-3381 filed. S.J. 1103. |
2017-04-20 | Senate | Amendment S-3369 adopted, as amended. S.J. 1103. |
2017-04-20 | Senate | Amendment S-3372 filed, lost. S.J. 1103. |
2017-04-20 | Senate | Amendment S-3382 filed, adopted. S.J. 1102. |
2017-04-20 | Senate | Amendment S-3369 filed. S.J. 1102. |
2017-04-20 | Senate | Deferred. S.J. 1102. |
2017-04-20 | Senate | Point of order raised on S-3380, ruled out of order. S.J. 1102. |
2017-04-20 | Senate | Amendment S-3380 filed. S.J. 1102. |
2017-04-20 | Senate | Point of order raised on S-3377, ruled out of order. S.J. 1102. |
2017-04-20 | Senate | Amendment S-3377 filed. S.J. 1101. |
2017-04-20 | Senate | Point of order raised on S-3375, ruled out of order. S.J. 1101. |
2017-04-20 | Senate | Amendment S-3375 filed. S.J. 1101. |
2017-04-20 | Senate | Point of order raised on S-3365, ruled out of order. S.J. 1101. |
2017-04-20 | Senate | Amendment S-3365 filed. S.J. 1101. |
2017-04-20 | Senate | Amendment S-3368 filed, lost. S.J. 1100. |
2017-04-20 | Senate | Deferred. S.J. 1098. |
2017-04-19 | Senate | Amendments S-3359, S-3361, and S-3362 filed. S.J. 1096. |
2017-04-18 | Senate | NOBA: Senate Full Approps |
2017-04-18 | Senate | Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 1060. |
2017-04-18 | Senate | Introduced, placed on Appropriations calendar. S.J. 1059. |
Same As/Similar To
SSB1198 (Related) 2017-04-18 - Subcommittee: Subcommittee of the Whole.