IA SF513 | 2011-2012 | 84th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 29 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-12-31 - END OF 2011 ACTIONS
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 29 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-12-31 - END OF 2011 ACTIONS
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to fees to fund programs to aid impaired pharmacists, pharmacist-interns, and pharmacy technicians. (Formerly SSB 1017 and SF 280.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to fees to fund programs to aid impaired pharmacists, pharmacist-interns, and pharmacy technicians. (Formerly SSB 1017 and SF 280.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-12-31 | END OF 2011 ACTIONS | |
2011-04-07 | Subcommittee, J. Taylor, Jacoby, and Pettengill. H.J. 985. | |
2011-03-30 | Read first time, referred to Ways & Means. H.J. 842. | |
2011-03-29 | Message from Senate. H.J. 834. | |
2011-03-29 | Immediate message. S.J. 826. | |
2011-03-29 | Passed Senate, ayes 38, nays 12. S.J. 825. | |
2011-03-23 | Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 789. | |
2011-03-23 | Introduced, placed on Ways and Means calendar. S.J. 788. |