IA SF512 | 2017-2018 | 87th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on January 31 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-01-31 - Signed by Governor. S.J. 338.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on January 31 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-01-31 - Signed by Governor. S.J. 338.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to water quality by amending the wastewater treatment financial assistance program, creating a water quality infrastructure fund, establishing a water quality financing program, providing for cost-share programs for infrastructure on agricultural and urban land under the water quality initiative, creating a water service excise tax and a related sales tax exemption, making transfers and appropriations and other changes properly related to water quality, and including effective date provisions. (Formerly SSB 1034 and SF 482.) Various effective dates; see section 27 of bill.
Title
A bill for an act relating to water quality by amending the wastewater treatment financial assistance program, creating a water quality infrastructure fund, establishing a water quality financing program, providing for cost-share programs for infrastructure on agricultural and urban land under the water quality initiative, creating a water service excise tax and a related sales tax exemption, making transfers and appropriations and other changes properly related to water quality, and including effective date provisions. (Formerly SSB 1034 and SF 482.) Various effective dates; see section 27 of bill.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-20 - House - Passed House (Y: 79 N: 19 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-19 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 31 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
1969-12-31 - House - Passed House (Y: 59 N: 41 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
1969-12-31 - House - Passed House (Y: 59 N: 41 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
1969-12-31 - House - Passed House (Y: 79 N: 19 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
1969-12-31 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 31 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-19 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 31 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
1969-12-31 - House - Passed House (Y: 59 N: 41 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
1969-12-31 - House - Passed House (Y: 59 N: 41 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
1969-12-31 - House - Passed House (Y: 79 N: 19 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
1969-12-31 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 31 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-31 | Senate | Signed by Governor. S.J. 338. |
2018-01-29 | Senate | Sent to Governor. S.J. 338. |
2018-01-29 | Senate | Reported correctly enrolled, signed by President and Speaker. S.J. 338. |
2018-01-31 | Senate | Fiscal note. |
2018-01-24 | Senate | Message from House. S.J. 148. |
2018-01-23 | House | Immediate message. H.J. 136. |
2018-01-23 | House | Passed House, ayes 59, nays 41. H.J. 136. |
2018-01-23 | House | House receded. H.J. 135. |
2017-04-21 | House | Message from Senate. H.J. 1119. |
2017-04-21 | Senate | Immediate message. S.J. 1116. |
2017-04-21 | Senate | Senate refused to concur with S-3387. S.J. 1116. |
2017-04-21 | Senate | Fiscal note. |
2017-04-21 | Senate | Message from House, with amendment S-3387. S.J. 1115. |
2017-04-20 | House | Immediate message. H.J. 1113. |
2017-04-21 | House | Explanation of vote. H.J. 1141. |
2017-04-20 | House | Passed House, ayes 79, nays 19. H.J. 1113. |
2017-04-20 | House | Amendment H-1440 adopted. H.J. 1112. |
2017-04-20 | House | Amendment H-1442 to H-1440 filed, lost. H.J. 1112. |
2017-04-20 | House | Amendment H-1440 filed. H.J. 1112. |
2017-04-20 | House | Substituted for HF 612. H.J. 1111. |
2017-04-20 | House | Read first time, passed on file. H.J. 1103. |
2017-04-19 | House | Message from Senate. H.J. 1094. |
2017-04-19 | Senate | Immediate message. S.J. 1081. |
2017-04-19 | Senate | Passed Senate, ayes 31, nays 19. S.J. 1080. |
2017-04-19 | Senate | Amendment S-3354 filed, lost. S.J. 1080. |
2017-04-19 | Senate | Amendment S-3358 filed, lost. S.J. 1079. |
2017-04-19 | Senate | Amendment S-3332 lost. S.J. 1078. |
2017-04-19 | Senate | Amendments S-3336 and S-3341 out of order. S.J. 1078. |
2017-04-19 | Senate | Amendment S-3356 filed, adopted. S.J. 1078. |
2017-04-19 | Senate | Amendment S-3331 lost. S.J. 1077. |
2017-04-19 | Senate | Point of order raised on S-3331, ruled in order. S.J. 1077. |
2017-04-18 | Senate | Fiscal note. |
2017-04-18 | Senate | Amendments S-3331, S-3332, S-3336, and S-3341 filed. S.J. 1061. |
2017-04-17 | Senate | Committee report, recommending passage. S.J. 1042. |
2017-04-17 | Senate | Subcommittee: Feenstra, Anderson, Behn, et al.. S.J. 1041. |
2017-04-17 | Senate | Referred to Ways and Means. S.J. 1025. |
2017-04-17 | Senate | Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 1025. |
2017-04-17 | Senate | Introduced, placed on Appropriations calendar. S.J. 1025. |
Same As/Similar To
SSB1034 (Related) 2017-03-01 - Subcommittee recommends passage.
SF482 (Similar To) 2017-04-05 - Subcommittee recommends passage.
SF482 (Similar To) 2017-04-05 - Subcommittee recommends passage.