IA SF507 | 2019-2020 | 88th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 23 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-23 - Signed by Governor. S.J. 1075.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 23 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-23 - Signed by Governor. S.J. 1075.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to the definition of personal injuries arising out of and in the course of the employment for the purposes of compensable acts for workers' compensation. (Formerly SSB 1205.) Effective 7-1-19.
Title
A bill for an act relating to the definition of personal injuries arising out of and in the course of the employment for the purposes of compensable acts for workers' compensation. (Formerly SSB 1205.) Effective 7-1-19.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-09 - House - Passed House (Y: 55 N: 44 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-19 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 32 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 32 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-19 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 32 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 32 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-23 | Senate | Signed by Governor. S.J. 1075. |
2019-04-22 | Senate | Reported correctly enrolled, signed by President and Speaker, and sent to Governor. S.J. 1045. |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Message from House. S.J. 910. |
2019-04-09 | House | Immediate message. H.J. 794. |
2019-04-09 | House | Explanation of vote. H.J. 795. |
2019-04-09 | House | Passed House, yeas 55 nays 44. H.J. 789. |
2019-04-09 | House | Point of order raised, Rule 10, decorum in debate, ruled point well taken. H.J. 788. |
2019-04-09 | House | Point of order raised, Rule 10, decorum in debate, ruled point well taken. H.J. 788. |
2019-04-09 | House | Amendment H-1153 lost. H.J. 788. |
2019-04-09 | House | Amendment H-1157 withdrawn. H.J. 787. |
2019-04-09 | House | Motion to suspend rules failed. H.J. 787. |
2019-04-09 | House | Motion to suspend rules for consideration of H-1156. H.J. 786. |
2019-04-09 | House | Point of order raised on H-1156, ruled not germane. H.J. 786. |
2019-04-09 | House | Motion to suspend rules failed. H.J. 786. |
2019-04-09 | House | Motion to suspend rules for consideration of H-1155. H.J. 785. |
2019-04-09 | House | Point of order raised on H-1155, ruled not germane. H.J. 785. |
2019-04-09 | House | Motion to suspend rules failed. H.J. 784. |
2019-04-09 | House | Motion to suspend rules for consideration of H-1154. H.J. 784. |
2019-04-09 | House | Point of order raised on H-1154, ruled not germane. H.J. 783. |
2019-04-09 | House | Motion to suspend rules failed. H.J. 783. |
2019-04-09 | House | Motion to suspend rules for consideration of H-1152. H.J. 782. |
2019-04-09 | House | Point of order raised on H-1152, ruled not germane. H.J. 782. |
2019-04-09 | House | Substituted for HF 593. H.J. 782. |
2019-04-08 | House | Amendments H-1152, H-1153, H-1154, H-1155, H-1156 and H-1157 filed. H.J. 767. |
2019-03-20 | House | Read first time, passed on file. H.J. 588. |
2019-03-20 | House | Message from Senate. H.J. 588. |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Immediate message. S.J. 672. |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Passed Senate, yeas 32, nays 17. S.J. 671. |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Amendment S-3045 filed, lost. S.J. 670. |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 487. |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Introduced, placed on calendar. S.J. 483. |
Same As/Similar To
HSB181 (Related) 2019-02-28 - Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. H.J. 381.
SSB1205 (Related) 2019-02-28 - Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage.
HF593 (Similar To) 2019-04-09 - Withdrawn. H.J. 795.
SSB1205 (Related) 2019-02-28 - Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage.
HF593 (Similar To) 2019-04-09 - Withdrawn. H.J. 795.