IA SF506 | 2017-2018 | 87th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 17 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2017-04-18 - Subcommittee: Vander Linden, Forbes and Nunn. H.J. 1075.
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

A bill for an act concerning the compassionate use of medical cannabis Act, reclassifying marijuana, including tetrahydrocannabinols, from a schedule I controlled substance to a schedule II controlled substance, providing for civil and criminal penalties and fees, and including effective date provisions. (Formerly SSB 1190.)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A bill for an act concerning the compassionate use of medical cannabis Act, reclassifying marijuana, including tetrahydrocannabinols, from a schedule I controlled substance to a schedule II controlled substance, providing for civil and criminal penalties and fees, and including effective date provisions. (Formerly SSB 1190.)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-04-17 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 45 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
1969-12-31 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 45 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-04-18HouseSubcommittee: Vander Linden, Forbes and Nunn. H.J. 1075.
2017-04-18HouseRead first time, referred to Ways and Means. H.J. 1039.
2017-04-17HouseMessage from Senate. H.J. 1034.
2017-04-17SenateImmediate message. S.J. 1037.
2017-04-17SenatePassed Senate, ayes 45, nays 5. S.J. 1037.
2017-04-17SenateFiscal note. Senate Clip Sheet.
2017-04-17SenateAmendment S-3327 filed, adopted. S.J. 1036.
2017-04-17SenateAmendment S-3321 filed, withdrawn. S.J. 1036.
2017-04-17SenateAmendment S-3324 filed, adopted. S.J. 1036.
2017-04-13SenateCommittee report, recommending passage. S.J. 1019.
2017-04-13SenateSubcommittee: Subcommittee of the Whole. S.J. 1017.
2017-04-13SenateReferred to Ways and Means. S.J. 1004.
2017-04-12SenateCommittee report, approving bill. S.J. 1000.
2017-04-12SenateIntroduced, placed on Appropriations calendar. S.J. 999.

Iowa State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback