IA SF505 | 2019-2020 | 88th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 10 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-10 - Signed by Governor. S.J. 1196.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 10 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-10 - Signed by Governor. S.J. 1196.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act modifying provisions relating to the licensure of professional landscape architects. (Formerly SSB 1173.) Effective 7-1-19.
Title
A bill for an act modifying provisions relating to the licensure of professional landscape architects. (Formerly SSB 1173.) Effective 7-1-19.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-17 - House - Passed House (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-21 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
House - Passed House (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-03-21 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
House - Passed House (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-10 | Senate | Signed by Governor. S.J. 1196. |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Reported correctly enrolled, signed by President and Speaker, and sent to Governor. S.J. 1193. |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Message from House. S.J. 995. |
2019-04-17 | House | Immediate message. H.J. 899. |
2019-04-24 | House | Explanation of vote. H.J. 1012. |
2019-04-17 | House | Passed House, yeas 97 nays none. H.J. 887. |
2019-04-17 | House | Substituted for HF 568. H.J. 887. |
2019-03-25 | House | Read first time, passed on file. H.J. 621. |
2019-03-21 | House | Message from Senate. H.J. 617. |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Immediate message. S.J. 702. |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Passed Senate, yeas 46, nays 0. S.J. 701. |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 486. |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Introduced, placed on calendar. S.J. 482. |
Same As/Similar To
HSB94 (Related) 2019-02-26 - Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 366.
SSB1173 (Related) 2019-02-28 - Subcommittee recommends passage.
HF568 (Similar To) 2019-04-17 - Withdrawn. H.J. 899.
SSB1173 (Related) 2019-02-28 - Subcommittee recommends passage.
HF568 (Similar To) 2019-04-17 - Withdrawn. H.J. 899.