IA SF504 | 2017-2018 | 87th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 5 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-05 - Signed by Governor. S.J. 1137.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 5 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-05 - Signed by Governor. S.J. 1137.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to mental health and disabilities, including the funding of mental health and disability services by modifying the mental health and disability services property tax levy, providing for the expenditure and deposit of certain county hospital property tax revenues, requiring the use of specified excess cash flow funds, including certain law enforcement notification provisions, and including effective date and applicability provisions. (Formerly SSB 1187.) Effective 5-5-17.
Title
A bill for an act relating to mental health and disabilities, including the funding of mental health and disability services by modifying the mental health and disability services property tax levy, providing for the expenditure and deposit of certain county hospital property tax revenues, requiring the use of specified excess cash flow funds, including certain law enforcement notification provisions, and including effective date and applicability provisions. (Formerly SSB 1187.) Effective 5-5-17.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-20 - House - Passed House (Y: 98 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-18 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 46 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
1969-12-31 - House - Passed House (Y: 98 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
1969-12-31 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 46 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-18 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 46 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
1969-12-31 - House - Passed House (Y: 98 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
1969-12-31 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 46 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-05 | Senate | Signed by Governor. S.J. 1137. |
2017-05-03 | Senate | Sent to Governor. S.J. 1134. |
2017-05-03 | Senate | Reported correctly enrolled, signed by President and Speaker. S.J. 1134. |
2017-04-20 | Senate | Message from House. S.J. 1111. |
2017-04-20 | House | Immediate message. H.J. 1111. |
2017-04-20 | House | Passed House, ayes 98, nays 1. H.J. 1102. |
2017-04-20 | House | Substituted for HF 650. H.J. 1101. |
2017-04-19 | House | Read first time, passed on file. H.J. 1078. |
2017-04-18 | House | Message from Senate. H.J. 1056. |
2017-04-18 | Senate | Immediate message. S.J. 1050. |
2017-04-18 | Senate | Passed Senate, ayes 46, nays 4. S.J. 1049. |
2017-04-18 | Senate | Amendment S-3333 filed, adopted. S.J. 1049. |
2017-04-11 | Senate | Fiscal note. |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 951. |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Introduced, placed on Ways and Means calendar. S.J. 951. |
Same As/Similar To
SSB1187 (Related) 2017-04-06 - Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage.