IA SF503 | 2015-2016 | 86th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 13 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-13 - Signed by Governor. S.J. 691.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 13 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-13 - Signed by Governor. S.J. 691.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to certain fees collected by the county sheriff. (Formerly SSB 1273.) Effective 7-1-16.
Title
A bill for an act relating to certain fees collected by the county sheriff. (Formerly SSB 1273.) Effective 7-1-16.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-04-06 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-22 - House - Passed House (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-06 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-22 - House - Passed House (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-06 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-13 | House | Signed by Governor. S.J. 691. |
2016-04-12 | House | Sent to Governor. S.J. 677. |
2016-04-12 | House | Reported correctly enrolled, signed by President and Speaker. S.J. 677. |
2016-04-06 | House | Message from Senate. H.J. 605. |
2016-04-06 | Senate | Immediate message. S.J. 629. |
2016-04-06 | Senate | Passed Senate, ayes 50, nays none. S.J. 624. |
2016-04-06 | Senate | Senate concurred with S-5100. S.J. 624. |
2016-03-23 | Senate | Message from House, with amendment S-5100. S.J. 579. |
2016-03-22 | House | Immediate message. H.J. 521. |
2016-03-22 | House | Passed House, ayes 99, nays none. H.J. 518. |
2016-03-22 | House | Committee amendment H-8072 adopted. H.J. 518. |
2016-03-03 | House | Committee amendment H-8072 filed. H.J. 418. |
2016-03-03 | House | Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. H.J. 417. |
2016-03-01 | House | Passed subcommittee. |
2016-02-10 | House | Subcommittee, Byrnes, Kelley, and Stanerson. H.J. 203. |
2015-05-06 | House | Read first time, referred to Ways & Means. H.J. 1025. |
2015-05-06 | House | Message from Senate. H.J. 1025. |
2015-05-06 | Senate | Immediate message. S.J. 983. |
2015-05-06 | Senate | Passed Senate, ayes 49, nays none. S.J. 980. |
2015-05-04 | Senate | Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 961. |
2015-05-04 | Senate | Introduced, placed on Ways and Means calendar. S.J. 959. |