IA SF502 | 2019-2020 | 88th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 10 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-10 - Signed by Governor. S.J. 1196.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 10 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-10 - Signed by Governor. S.J. 1196.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to disclosures of certain information, including reprisals with respect to employees of the state and a political subdivision of the state and providing information to employees concerning the office of ombudsman. (Formerly SF 400.) Effective 7-1-19.
Title
A bill for an act relating to disclosures of certain information, including reprisals with respect to employees of the state and a political subdivision of the state and providing information to employees concerning the office of ombudsman. (Formerly SF 400.) Effective 7-1-19.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-25 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-22 - House - Passed House (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-26 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-22 - House - Passed House (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-26 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-10 | House | Signed by Governor. S.J. 1196. |
2019-05-03 | House | Reported correctly enrolled, signed by President and Speaker, and sent to Governor. S.J. 1193. |
2019-04-25 | House | Message from Senate. H.J. 1037. |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Immediate message. S.J. 1130. |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Passed Senate, yeas 50, nays 0. S.J. 1128. |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Senate concurred with S-3204. S.J. 1128. |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Message from House, with amendment S-3204. S.J. 1048. |
2019-04-22 | House | Immediate message. H.J. 945. |
2019-04-22 | House | Passed House, yeas 98 nays none. H.J. 931. |
2019-04-22 | House | Committee amendment H-1201 adopted, as amended. H.J. 931. |
2019-04-22 | House | Amendment H-1259 to committee amendment H-1201 adopted. H.J. 931. |
2019-04-22 | House | Amendment H-1259 to committee amendment H-1201 filed. H.J. 930. |
2019-04-11 | House | Committee amendment H-1201 filed. H.J. 844. |
2019-04-11 | House | Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. H.J. 844. |
2019-04-11 | House | Placed on calendar under unfinished business. H.J. 843. |
2019-04-01 | House | Subcommittee recommends passage. |
2019-03-28 | House | Subcommittee Meeting: 04/01/2019 12:45PM House Lounge. |
2019-03-28 | House | Subcommittee: Jacobsen, Lensing and Thompson. H.J. 690. |
2019-03-27 | House | Read first time, referred to State Government. H.J. 656. |
2019-03-26 | House | Message from Senate. H.J. 648. |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Immediate message. S.J. 741. |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Passed Senate, yeas 49, nays 0. S.J. 739. |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 491. |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Introduced, placed on calendar. S.J. 482. |
Same As/Similar To
SF400 (Similar To) 2019-03-06 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 502. S.J. 491.