IA SF502 | 2015-2016 | 86th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on May 4 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-02-22 - Amendment S-5013 filed. S.J. 309.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 4 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-02-22 - Amendment S-5013 filed. S.J. 309.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to the regulation of persons, including commercial establishments, keeping nonagricultural animals, providing for fees and appropriations, and making penalties applicable. (Formerly SF 168 and SF 347.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to the regulation of persons, including commercial establishments, keeping nonagricultural animals, providing for fees and appropriations, and making penalties applicable. (Formerly SF 168 and SF 347.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-22 | Senate | Amendment S-5013 filed. S.J. 309. |
2016-02-22 | Senate | Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. S.J. 309. |
2016-02-10 | Senate | Returned to committee. |
2016-02-03 | Senate | Subcommittee reassigned, McCoy, Bertrand, and Bolkcom. S.J. 151. |
2016-01-12 | Senate | Subcommittee, McCoy, Bolkcom, and Zumbach. S.J. 46. |
2015-06-05 | Senate | Referred to Commerce. S.J. 1122. |
2015-05-04 | Senate | Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 961. |
2015-05-04 | Senate | Introduced, placed on Ways and Means calendar. S.J. 959. |
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=86&ba=SF502 |
Text | http://coolice.legis.iowa.gov/Legislation/86thGA/Bills/SenateFiles/Introduced/SF502.html |