IA SF490 | 2019-2020 | 88th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on March 6 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-16 - Subcommittee: Greene, Quirmbach, and Segebart. S.J. 109.
Pending: Senate Human Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 6 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-16 - Subcommittee: Greene, Quirmbach, and Segebart. S.J. 109.
Pending: Senate Human Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to tobacco cessation services under the Medicaid program. (Formerly SSB 1189.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to tobacco cessation services under the Medicaid program. (Formerly SSB 1189.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-16 | Senate | Subcommittee: Greene, Quirmbach, and Segebart. S.J. 109. |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Referred to Human Resources. S.J. 858. |
2019-03-18 | Senate | Fiscal note. |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 488. |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Introduced, placed on calendar. S.J. 480. |
Same As/Similar To
SSB1189 (Related) 2019-02-25 - Subcommittee Meeting: 02/27/2019 11:30AM RM 24.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=88&ba=SF490 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/88/attachments/SF490.html |