IA SF488 | 2015-2016 | 86th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 15 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-15 - Signed by Governor. S.J. 1037.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 15 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-15 - Signed by Governor. S.J. 1037.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to air quality, by providing for the establishment, imposition, and collection of fees, the creation or administration of funds and programs, making appropriations, and including effective date provisions. (Formerly SSB 1222 and SF 382.) Effective 5-15-15.
Title
A bill for an act relating to air quality, by providing for the establishment, imposition, and collection of fees, the creation or administration of funds and programs, making appropriations, and including effective date provisions. (Formerly SSB 1222 and SF 382.) Effective 5-15-15.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-04-22 - House - Passed House (Y: 93 N: 3 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-13 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 41 N: 6 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-13 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 41 N: 6 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-15 | Senate | Signed by Governor. S.J. 1037. |
2015-05-12 | Senate | Sent to Governor. S.J. 1019. |
2015-05-12 | Senate | Reported correctly enrolled, signed by President and Speaker. S.J. 1019. |
2015-04-22 | Senate | Message from House. S.J. 911. |
2015-04-22 | House | Immediate message. H.J. 911. |
2015-04-30 | House | Explanation of vote. H.J. 969. |
2015-04-22 | House | Passed House, ayes 93, nays 3. H.J. 902. |
2015-04-22 | House | Amendment H-1243 lost. H.J. 902. |
2015-04-22 | House | Substituted for HF 640. H.J. 901. |
2015-04-21 | House | Amendment H-1243 filed. H.J. 898. |
2015-04-20 | House | Read first time, passed on file. H.J. 873. |
2015-04-14 | House | Message from Senate. H.J. 827. |
2015-04-13 | Senate | Immediate message. S.J. 843. |
2015-04-13 | Senate | Passed Senate, ayes 41, nays 6. S.J. 838. |
2015-04-13 | Senate | Fiscal note. SCS. |
2015-04-13 | Senate | Amendment S-3115 adopted. S.J. 838. |
2015-04-09 | Senate | Amendment S-3115 filed. S.J. 836. |
2015-04-02 | Senate | Placed on calendar under unfinished business. S.J. 768. |
2015-04-01 | Senate | Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 766. |
2015-04-01 | Senate | Introduced, placed on Ways and Means calendar. S.J. 763. |