IA SF486 | 2015-2016 | 86th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 22 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-22 - Signed by Governor. S.J. 1041.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 22 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-22 - Signed by Governor. S.J. 1041.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to the approval and imposition of the facilities property tax levy and the equipment replacement and program sharing property tax levy for a merged area and including effective date and applicability provisions. (Formerly SF 371.) Effective 5-22-15.
Title
A bill for an act relating to the approval and imposition of the facilities property tax levy and the equipment replacement and program sharing property tax levy for a merged area and including effective date and applicability provisions. (Formerly SF 371.) Effective 5-22-15.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-05-12 - House - Passed House (Y: 95 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-07 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 43 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-07 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 43 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-22 | Senate | Signed by Governor. S.J. 1041. |
2015-05-19 | Senate | Sent to Governor. S.J. 1038. |
2015-05-19 | Senate | Reported correctly enrolled, signed by President and Speaker. S.J. 1038. |
2015-05-13 | Senate | Message from House. S.J. 1020. |
2015-05-12 | House | Immediate message. H.J. 1050. |
2015-05-12 | House | Passed House, ayes 95, nays 3. H.J. 1047. |
2015-05-05 | House | Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 1014. |
2015-05-05 | House | Passed subcommittee. |
2015-04-14 | House | Subcommittee, Cownie, Byrnes, and Steckman. H.J. 843. |
2015-04-08 | House | Read first time, referred to Ways & Means. H.J. 794. |
2015-04-08 | House | Message from Senate. H.J. 793. |
2015-04-07 | Senate | Immediate message. S.J. 795. |
2015-04-07 | Senate | Passed Senate, ayes 43, nays 7. S.J. 795. |
2015-04-03 | Senate | Fiscal note. SCS. |
2015-04-02 | Senate | Placed on calendar under unfinished business. S.J. 768. |
2015-04-01 | Senate | Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 765. |
2015-04-01 | Senate | Introduced, placed on Ways and Means calendar. S.J. 763. |