IA SF484 | 2009-2010 | 83rd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 22 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-01-07 - * * * * * END OF 2009 ACTIONS * * * * *
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 22 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-01-07 - * * * * * END OF 2009 ACTIONS * * * * *
Summary
A bill for an act relating to regulatory requirements involving boarding homes and dependent adults and providing an appropriation and a penalty. (Formerly SSB 1326.) Effective 7-1-09.
Title
A bill for an act relating to regulatory requirements involving boarding homes and dependent adults and providing an appropriation and a penalty. (Formerly SSB 1326.) Effective 7-1-09.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-01-07 | * * * * * END OF 2009 ACTIONS * * * * * | |
2009-05-22 | Signed by Governor. S.J. 1283. | |
2009-04-26 | Sent to Governor. S.J. 1279. | |
2009-04-26 | Reported correctly enrolled, signed by President and Speaker. S.J. 1279. | |
2009-04-24 | Message from Senate. H.J. 1703. | |
2009-04-23 | Immediate message. S.J. 1210. | |
2009-04-23 | Passed Senate, ayes 49, nays none. S.J. 1207. | |
2009-04-23 | Senate concurred with S-3321. S.J. 1207. | |
2009-04-23 | Message from House, with amendment S-3321. S.J. 1199. | |
2009-04-23 | Immediate message. H.J. 1678. | |
2009-04-23 | Passed House, ayes 93, nays none. H.J. 1678. | |
2009-04-23 | Amendment H-1652 withdrawn. H.J. 1677. | |
2009-04-23 | Amendment H-1676 adopted. H.J. 1677. | |
2009-04-23 | Amendment H-1676 filed. H.J. 1676. | |
2009-04-21 | Amendment H-1652 filed. H.J. 1612. | |
2009-04-17 | Committee report recommending passage. H.J. 1531. | |
2009-04-16 | Subcommittee, Jacoby, Heddens, and Watts. H.J. 1527. | |
2009-04-15 | Read first time, referred to Appropriations. H.J. 1475. | |
2009-04-15 | Message from Senate. H.J. 1475. | |
2009-04-15 | Immediate message. S.J. 1103. | |
2009-04-15 | Passed Senate, ayes 50, nays none. S.J. 1099. | |
2009-04-15 | Amendment S-3248 adopted. S.J. 1098. | |
2009-04-14 | Fiscal note. SCS. | |
2009-04-14 | Amendment S-3248 filed. S.J. 1093. | |
2009-04-10 | Placed on calendar under unfinished business. S.J. 1058. | |
2009-04-09 | Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 1053. | |
2009-04-09 | Introduced, placed on calendar. S.J. 1051. |
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://coolice.legis.state.ia.us/Cool-ICE/default.asp?Category=BillInfo&Service=DspHistory&var=SF&key=0530B&ga=83 |