IA SF481 | 2017-2018 | 87th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-10 - Signed by Governor. S.J. 901.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

A bill for an act relating to the enforcement of immigration laws and providing penalties and remedies, including the denial of state funds to certain entities. (Formerly SSB 1172.) Effective 7-1-18.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A bill for an act relating to the enforcement of immigration laws and providing penalties and remedies, including the denial of state funds to certain entities. (Formerly SSB 1172.) Effective 7-1-18.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-04-12 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 32 N: 15 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
1969-12-31 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 28 N: 18 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
1969-12-31 - House - Passed House (Y: 55 N: 45 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
1969-12-31 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 32 N: 15 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-10HouseSigned by Governor. S.J. 901.
2018-04-10HouseReported correctly enrolled, signed by President and Speaker, and sent to Governor. S.J. 901.
2018-04-05HouseMessage from Senate. H.J. 751.
2018-04-04SenateImmediate message. S.J. 885.
2018-04-04SenatePassed Senate, ayes 28, nays 18. S.J. 885.
2018-04-04SenateSenate concurred with S-5216. S.J. 884.
2018-04-04SenateAmendment S-5227 to S-5216 filed, lost. S.J. 884.
2018-04-04SenateAmendment S-5228 to S-5216 filed, lost. S.J. 883.
2018-04-04SenateDeferred. S.J. 880.
2018-04-04SenateDeferred. S.J. 876.
2018-04-04SenateMessage from House, with amendment S-5216. S.J. 861.
2018-04-03HouseImmediate message. H.J. 732.
2018-04-03HousePassed House, ayes 55, nays 45. H.J. 731.
2018-04-03HousePoint of order raised, Rule 10, decorum in debate, ruled point not well taken. H.J. 730.
2018-04-03HousePoint of order raised, Rule 10, decorum in debate, ruled point well taken. H.J. 730.
2018-04-03HousePoint of order raised, Rule 10, decorum in debate, Speaker resolved point of order H.J. 730.
2018-04-03HousePoint of order raised, Rule 10, decorum in debate, ruled point not well taken. H.J. 729.
2018-04-03HouseDeferred, retained on calendar. H.J. 728.
2018-04-03HousePoint of order raised, Rule 10, decorum in debate, ruled point well taken. H.J. 728.
2018-04-03HouseAmendment H-8347 filed, withdrawn. H.J. 728.
2018-04-03HouseAmendment H-8321 withdrawn. H.J. 728.
2018-04-03HouseAmendment H-8336 adopted. H.J. 728.
2018-04-03HouseCommittee amendment H-8202 adopted, as amended. H.J. 727.
2018-04-03HouseMotion to suspend rules failed. H.J. 727.
2018-04-03HouseMotion to suspend rules for immediate consideration of H-8240, to committee amendment H-8202. H.J. 726.
2018-04-03HousePoint of order raised on H-8240 to committee amendment H-8202, ruled not germane. H.J. 726.
2018-04-03HouseAmendment H-8319 to committee amendment H-8202 filed, adopted. H.J. 726.
2018-03-27HouseAmendment H-8336 filed. H.J. 691.
2018-03-26HouseAmendments H-8319 and H-8321 filed. H.J. 679.
2018-03-22HousePlaced on calendar under unfinished business. H.J. 671.
2018-03-13HouseFiscal note.
2018-03-08HouseAmendment H-8240 filed. H.J. 550.
2018-03-07HouseCommittee amendment H-8202 filed. H.J. 517.
2018-03-07HouseCommittee report, recommending amendment and passage. H.J. 516.
2018-01-31HouseSubcommittee recommends passage.
2018-01-29HouseFiscal note.
2018-01-23HouseSubcommittee: Holt, Breckenridge and Heartsill. H.J. 142.
2017-04-13HouseRead first time, referred to Public Safety. H.J. 1002.
2017-04-13HouseMessage from Senate. H.J. 1001.
2017-04-12SenateImmediate message. S.J. 995.
2017-04-12SenatePassed Senate, ayes 32, nays 15, present 1. S.J. 995.
2017-04-12SenateAmendment S-3300 adopted. S.J. 993.
2017-04-12SenateAmendment S-3315 filed, lost. S.J. 993.
2017-04-12SenateDeferred. S.J. 974.
2017-04-10SenateAmendment S-3300 filed. S.J. 952.
2017-03-31SenatePlaced on calendar under unfinished business. S.J. 838.
2017-03-07SenateCommittee report, approving bill. S.J. 512.
2017-03-07SenateIntroduced, placed on calendar. S.J. 506.

Same As/Similar To

SSB1172 (Related) 2017-03-02 - Subcommittee recommends passage.

Iowa State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback