IA SF480 | 2021-2022 | 89th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 25 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-17 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2322. S.J. 332.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 25 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-17 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2322. S.J. 332.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to the assessment of fees when a person requests examination and copying of public records.(Formerly SF 218; See SF 2322.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to the assessment of fees when a person requests examination and copying of public records.(Formerly SF 218; See SF 2322.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-17 | Senate | Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2322. S.J. 332. |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage. |
2022-02-09 | Senate | Subcommittee Meeting: 02/10/2022 10:00AM Room G17. |
2022-01-18 | Senate | Subcommittee: Brown, Bisignano, and Johnson. S.J. 109. |
2021-06-22 | Senate | Referred to State Government. S.J. 1148. |
2021-04-01 | Senate | Placed on calendar under unfinished business. S.J. 725. |
2021-03-01 | Senate | Fiscal note. |
2021-02-25 | Senate | Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 476. |
2021-02-25 | Senate | Introduced, placed on calendar. S.J. 467. |
Same As/Similar To
SF218 (Similar To) 2022-01-12 - Subcommittee reassigned: Brown, Bisignano, and Johnson. S.J. 79.
HF637 (Similar To) 2021-12-31 - END OF [] ACTIONS
HF786 (Similar To) 2021-04-19 - Fiscal note.
SF2322 (Similar To) 2022-06-24 - Fiscal note.
HF637 (Similar To) 2021-12-31 - END OF [] ACTIONS
HF786 (Similar To) 2021-04-19 - Fiscal note.
SF2322 (Similar To) 2022-06-24 - Fiscal note.