IA SF480 | 2015-2016 | 86th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 26 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-03-27 - Read first time, referred to Ways & Means. H.J. 722.
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 26 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-03-27 - Read first time, referred to Ways & Means. H.J. 722.
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act authorizing a city or county to provide a property tax exemption for value added by improvements to residential property that is a public nuisance. (Formerly SF 25 and SF 278.)
Title
A bill for an act authorizing a city or county to provide a property tax exemption for value added by improvements to residential property that is a public nuisance. (Formerly SF 25 and SF 278.)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-03-26 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-27 | House | Read first time, referred to Ways & Means. H.J. 722. |
2015-03-27 | House | Message from Senate. H.J. 721. |
2015-03-26 | Senate | Immediate message. S.J. 722. |
2015-03-26 | Senate | Passed Senate, ayes 49, nays none. S.J. 722. |
2015-03-23 | Senate | Fiscal note. SCS. |
2015-03-19 | Senate | Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 654. |
2015-03-19 | Senate | Introduced, placed on Ways and Means calendar. S.J. 654. |