IA SF468 | 2021-2022 | 89th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 17 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-01-19 - Placed on calendar. H.J. 98.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 17 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-01-19 - Placed on calendar. H.J. 98.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act removing a preference for purchasing of Iowa coal by state and local government entities.(Formerly SSB 1201.)
Title
A bill for an act removing a preference for purchasing of Iowa coal by state and local government entities.(Formerly SSB 1201.)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-17 - Senate - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 45 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-02-25 - Senate - Senate State Government Report (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-25 - Senate - Senate State Government Report (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-19 | House | Placed on calendar. H.J. 98. |
2022-01-18 | House | Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 98. |
2022-01-18 | House | Subcommittee recommends passage. Vote Total: 3-0 |
2022-01-12 | House | Subcommittee Meeting: 01/13/2022 1:00PM RM 304.1. |
2022-01-11 | House | Subcommittee reassigned: Fisher, Cisneros and McConkey. H.J. 50. |
2021-05-20 | House | Rereferred to Commerce. H.J. 1203. |
2021-04-08 | House | Placed on calendar under unfinished business. H.J. 920. |
2021-03-31 | House | Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 873. |
2021-03-25 | House | Subcommittee recommends passage. Vote Total: 3-0 |
2021-03-25 | House | Subcommittee Meeting: 03/25/2021 12:00PM House Lounge #1. |
2021-03-24 | House | Subcommittee Meeting: 03/25/2021 7:30AM House Lounge 1. |
2021-03-23 | House | Subcommittee: Lundgren, Cisneros and McConkey. H.J. 830. |
2021-03-22 | House | Read first time, referred to Commerce. H.J. 761. |
2021-03-17 | House | Message from Senate. H.J. 742. |
2021-03-17 | Senate | Immediate message. S.J. 627. |
2021-03-17 | Senate | Passed Senate, yeas 45, nays 2. S.J. 627. |
2021-02-25 | Senate | Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 474. |
2021-02-25 | Senate | Introduced, placed on calendar. S.J. 465. |
Same As/Similar To
SSB1201 (Related) 2021-02-24 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 468.