IA SF462 | 2019-2020 | 88th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 1 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-02 - Subcommittee: Hite, Jones and Wolfe. H.J. 712.
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 1 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-02 - Subcommittee: Hite, Jones and Wolfe. H.J. 712.
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to restrictions on bailable defendants charged with homicide by motor vehicle. (Formerly SSB 1008.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to restrictions on bailable defendants charged with homicide by motor vehicle. (Formerly SSB 1008.)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-01 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 44 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 44 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 44 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-02 | House | Subcommittee: Hite, Jones and Wolfe. H.J. 712. |
2019-04-02 | House | Read first time, referred to Judiciary. H.J. 711. |
2019-04-01 | House | Message from Senate. H.J. 705. |
2019-04-01 | Senate | Immediate message. S.J. 806. |
2019-04-01 | Senate | Passed Senate, yeas 44, nays 4. S.J. 803. |
2019-03-04 | Senate | Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 458. |
2019-03-04 | Senate | Introduced, placed on calendar. S.J. 450. |
Same As/Similar To
SSB1008 (Related) 2019-01-22 - Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage.
HSB27 (Related) 2019-01-23 - Subcommittee Meeting: 01/30/2019 8:00AM House Lounge.
HSB27 (Related) 2019-01-23 - Subcommittee Meeting: 01/30/2019 8:00AM House Lounge.