IA SF456 | 2017-2018 | 87th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 6 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-04-22 - Referred to Agriculture. S.J. 1134.
Pending: Senate Agriculture Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

A bill for an act relating to the governing of certain water utilities and including effective date provisions. (Formerly SSB 1146.)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A bill for an act relating to the governing of certain water utilities and including effective date provisions. (Formerly SSB 1146.)

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-04-22SenateReferred to Agriculture. S.J. 1134.
2017-03-31SenatePlaced on calendar under unfinished business. S.J. 838.
2017-03-08SenateAmendment S-3112 filed. S.J. 539.
2017-03-06SenateCommittee report, approving bill. S.J. 477.
2017-03-06SenateIntroduced, placed on calendar. S.J. 476.

Iowa State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback