IA SF454 | 2021-2022 | 89th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 24 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-07 - Withdrawn. S.J. 825.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 24 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-07 - Withdrawn. S.J. 825.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act providing for the termination of dealership agreements involving agricultural equipment.(Formerly SSB 1187.)
Title
A bill for an act providing for the termination of dealership agreements involving agricultural equipment.(Formerly SSB 1187.)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-02-24 - Senate - Senate Commerce Report (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-07 | Senate | Withdrawn. S.J. 825. |
2021-04-07 | Senate | HF 556 substituted. S.J. 824. |
2021-04-01 | Senate | Placed on calendar under unfinished business. S.J. 725. |
2021-02-24 | Senate | Attached to companion HF 556. S.J. 451. |
2021-02-24 | Senate | Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 456. |
2021-02-24 | Senate | Introduced, placed on calendar. S.J. 454. |
Same As/Similar To
HSB181 (Related) 2021-02-16 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 556.
SSB1187 (Related) 2021-02-24 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 454.
HF556 (Similar To) 2021-04-30 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 1038.
SSB1187 (Related) 2021-02-24 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 454.
HF556 (Similar To) 2021-04-30 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 1038.