IA SF451 | 2017-2018 | 87th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 21 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-21 - Signed by Governor. S.J. 1126.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 21 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-21 - Signed by Governor. S.J. 1126.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to certain payments made through a county treasurer’s internet site. (Formerly SSB 1152.) Effective 7-1-17.
Title
A bill for an act relating to certain payments made through a county treasurer’s internet site. (Formerly SSB 1152.) Effective 7-1-17.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-11 - House - Passed House (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-13 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
1969-12-31 - House - Passed House (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
1969-12-31 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-13 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
1969-12-31 - House - Passed House (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
1969-12-31 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-21 | Senate | Signed by Governor. S.J. 1126. |
2017-04-18 | Senate | Sent to Governor. S.J. 1061. |
2017-04-18 | Senate | Reported correctly enrolled, signed by President and Speaker. S.J. 1061. |
2017-04-11 | Senate | Message from House. S.J. 969. |
2017-04-11 | House | Immediate message. H.J. 977. |
2017-04-11 | House | Passed House, ayes 96, nays 0. H.J. 975. |
2017-04-06 | House | Placed on calendar under unfinished business. H.J. 905. |
2017-03-30 | House | Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 822. |
2017-03-27 | House | Subcommittee: Deyoe, Kressig and McKean. H.J. 788. |
2017-03-13 | House | Read first time, referred to Local Government. H.J. 630. |
2017-03-13 | House | Message from Senate. H.J. 625. |
2017-03-13 | Senate | Immediate message. S.J. 572. |
2017-03-13 | Senate | Passed Senate, ayes 49, nays 0. S.J. 570. |
2017-03-06 | Senate | Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 481. |
2017-03-06 | Senate | Introduced, placed on calendar. S.J. 475. |
Same As/Similar To
SSB1152 (Related) 2017-02-28 - Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage.