IA SF45 | 2021-2022 | 89th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-03 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 241. S.J. 254.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 12 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-03 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 241. S.J. 254.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to the dissemination and exhibition of obscene material to a minor by the parent or guardian of the minor, and providing penalties.(See SF 241.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to the dissemination and exhibition of obscene material to a minor by the parent or guardian of the minor, and providing penalties.(See SF 241.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-03 | Senate | Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 241. S.J. 254. |
2021-01-20 | Senate | Subcommittee recommends passage. |
2021-01-19 | Senate | Subcommittee Meeting: 01/20/2021 8:30AM RM 111. |
2021-01-13 | Senate | Subcommittee: Kinney, Sinclair, and J. Taylor. S.J. 97. |
2021-01-12 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Judiciary. S.J. 69. |
Same As/Similar To
SF241 (Similar To) 2022-03-24 - Referred to Judiciary. S.J. 621.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=89&ba=SF45 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/89/attachments/SF45.html |