IA SF448 | 2019-2020 | 88th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 25 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-10 - Placed on calendar H.J. 568.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 25 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-10 - Placed on calendar H.J. 568.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to consent agreements for domestic abuse and sexual abuse protective orders. (Formerly SF 254.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to consent agreements for domestic abuse and sexual abuse protective orders. (Formerly SF 254.)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-25 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-10 | House | Placed on calendar H.J. 568. |
2020-03-10 | House | Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 568. |
2020-03-04 | House | Subcommittee recommends passage. |
2020-03-02 | House | Subcommittee Meeting: 03/04/2020 11:00AM House Lounge. |
2020-02-24 | House | Subcommittee reassigned: Hite, Gustafson and Wolfe. H.J. 350. |
2019-04-27 | House | Rereferred to Judiciary. H.J. 1076. |
2019-04-11 | House | Placed on calendar under unfinished business. H.J. 843. |
2019-04-03 | House | Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 739. |
2019-04-01 | House | Subcommittee recommends passage. |
2019-03-28 | House | Subcommittee Meeting: 04/01/2019 3:00PM House Lounge. |
2019-03-26 | House | Subcommittee: Bergan, Hite and Wolfe. H.J. 652. |
2019-03-26 | House | Referred to Judiciary. H.J. 627. |
2019-03-26 | House | Message from Senate. H.J. 627. |
2019-03-25 | Senate | Immediate message. S.J. 720. |
2019-03-25 | Senate | Passed Senate, yeas 50, nays 0. S.J. 720. |
2019-03-04 | Senate | Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 456. |
2019-03-04 | Senate | Introduced, placed on calendar. S.J. 448. |
Same As/Similar To
SF254 (Similar To) 2019-03-04 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 448. S.J. 456.
HF522 (Similar To) 2019-02-26 - Introduced, referred to Judiciary. H.J. 356.
HF522 (Similar To) 2019-02-26 - Introduced, referred to Judiciary. H.J. 356.