IA SF448 | 2015-2016 | 86th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 24 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-24 - Signed by Governor. S.J. 932.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 24 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-24 - Signed by Governor. S.J. 932.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to the commission of a class "A" felony by a person under eighteen years of age, providing penalties, and including effective date and applicability provisions. (Formerly SSB 1185.) Effective 4-24-15.
Title
A bill for an act relating to the commission of a class "A" felony by a person under eighteen years of age, providing penalties, and including effective date and applicability provisions. (Formerly SSB 1185.) Effective 4-24-15.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-04-08 - House - Passed House (Y: 80 N: 18 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-17 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 47 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-17 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 47 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-24 | Senate | Signed by Governor. S.J. 932. |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Sent to Governor. S.J. 906. |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Reported correctly enrolled, signed by President and Speaker. S.J. 906. |
2015-04-09 | Senate | Message from House. S.J. 832. |
2015-04-08 | House | Immediate message. H.J. 806. |
2015-04-14 | House | Explanation of vote. H.J. 842. |
2015-04-14 | House | Explanation of vote. H.J. 841. |
2015-04-08 | House | Passed House, ayes 80, nays 18. H.J. 803. |
2015-03-26 | House | Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 719. |
2015-03-24 | House | Passed subcommittee. |
2015-03-17 | House | Subcommittee, Baltimore, Rizer, and Wolfe. H.J. 635. |
2015-03-17 | House | Read first time, referred to Judiciary. H.J. 621. |
2015-03-17 | House | Message from Senate. H.J. 617. |
2015-03-17 | Senate | Immediate message. S.J. 627. |
2015-03-17 | Senate | Passed Senate, ayes 47, nays 3. S.J. 626. |
2015-03-09 | Senate | Committee report, without recommendation. S.J. 489. |
2015-03-09 | Senate | Introduced, placed on calendar. S.J. 481. |