IA SF447 | 2013-2014 | 85th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 20 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-12-31 - END OF 2013 ACTIONS
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 20 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-12-31 - END OF 2013 ACTIONS
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to appropriations to the justice system and including effective dates. (Formerly SSB 1249.) Item vetoed. Various effective dates; see sections 39 and 46 of bill.
Title
A bill for an act relating to appropriations to the justice system and including effective dates. (Formerly SSB 1249.) Item vetoed. Various effective dates; see sections 39 and 46 of bill.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-12-31 | House | END OF 2013 ACTIONS |
2013-06-20 | House | Item vetoed, signed by Governor. S.J. 1071. |
2013-05-23 | House | Sent to Governor. S.J. 1063. |
2013-05-23 | House | Reported correctly enrolled, signed by President and Speaker. S.J. 1063. |
2013-05-23 | House | Message from House. S.J. 1061. |
2013-05-23 | Senate | Pursuant to Rule 73.6, motion to reconsider failed. H.J. 1112. |
2013-05-15 | Senate | Motion filed to reconsider vote on the bill by Upmeyer. H.J. 1060. |
2013-05-17 | Senate | Explanation of vote. H.J. 1079. |
2013-05-15 | Senate | Passed House, ayes 94, nays 3. H.J. 1058. |
2013-05-15 | Senate | Conference committee report adopted. H.J. 1058. |
2013-05-15 | Senate | Conference committee report filed. H.J. 1058. |
2013-05-15 | Senate | Message from Senate. H.J. 1052. |
2013-05-15 | House | Immediate message. S.J. 1004. |
2013-05-15 | House | Passed Senate, ayes 27, nays 18. S.J. 1002. |
2013-05-15 | House | Conference committee report adopted. S.J. 1002. |
2013-05-15 | House | Conference committee report filed. S.J. 1001. |
2013-04-25 | House | Message from Senate. H.J. 942. |
2013-04-25 | Senate | Immediate message. S.J. 909. |
2013-04-25 | Senate | Senate conference committee appointed, Courtney, Chapman, Hogg, Schneider, and Taylor. S.J. 908. |
2013-04-25 | Senate | Message from House. S.J. 908. |
2013-04-25 | House | Immediate message. H.J. 942. |
2013-04-25 | House | House conference committee appointed Worthan, Garrett, Baltimore, Anderson, and T. Taylor. H.J. 941. |
2013-04-25 | House | House insisted. H.J. 941. |
2013-04-25 | House | Message from Senate. H.J. 941. |
2013-04-24 | Senate | Immediate message. S.J. 906. |
2013-04-24 | Senate | Senate refused to concur with S-3179. S.J. 901. |
2013-04-24 | Senate | Message from House, with amendment S-3179. S.J. 897. |
2013-04-23 | House | Immediate message. H.J. 922. |
2013-04-23 | House | Passed House, ayes 51, nays 46. H.J. 917. |
2013-04-23 | House | Committee amendment H-1329 as amended, adopted. H.J. 916. |
2013-04-23 | House | Amendment H-1362 to amendment H-1329 filed, lost. H.J. 915. |
2013-04-23 | House | Amendment H-1361 to amendment H-1329 lost. H.J. 915. |
2013-04-23 | House | Amendment H-1361 to amendment H-1329 filed. H.J. 914. |
2013-04-23 | House | Amendment H-1348 to amendment H-1329 filed, withdrawn. H.J. 914. |
2013-04-23 | House | Amendment H-1347 to amendment H-1329 filed, adopted. H.J. 914. |
2013-04-23 | House | Amendment H-1355 to amendment H-1329 filed, adopted. H.J. 914. |
2013-04-23 | House | Amendment H-1360 to amendment H-1329 lost. H.J. 914. |
2013-04-23 | House | Amendment H-1360 to amendment H-1329 filed. H.J. 913. |
2013-04-23 | House | Amendment H-1364 to amendment H-1329 lost. H.J. 913. |
2013-04-23 | House | Amendment H-1364 to amendment H-1329 filed. H.J. 912. |
2013-04-23 | House | Amendment H-1365 to amendment H-1329 lost. H.J. 912. |
2013-04-23 | House | Amendment H-1365 to amendment H-1329 filed. H.J. 911. |
2013-04-23 | House | Amendment H-1353 to amendment H-1329 adopted. H.J. 911. |
2013-04-23 | House | Amendment H-1353 to amendment H-1329 filed. H.J. 910. |
2013-04-23 | House | Amendment H-1363 to amendment H-1329 lost. H.J. 910. |
2013-04-23 | House | Amendment H-1363 to amendment H-1329 filed. H.J. 909. |
2013-04-23 | House | Asked and received unanimous consent for the immediate consideration. H.J. 909. |
2013-04-22 | House | Committee amendment H-1329 filed. H.J. 886. |
2013-04-22 | House | Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. H.J. 885. |
2013-04-18 | House | Subcommittee, Worthan, Garrett, and T. Taylor. H.J. 879. |
2013-04-18 | House | Read first time, referred to Appropriations. H.J. 878. |
2013-04-17 | House | Message from Senate. H.J. 874. |
2013-04-17 | Senate | Immediate message. S.J. 866. |
2013-04-17 | Senate | Passed Senate, ayes 26, nays 23. S.J. 866. |
2013-04-17 | Senate | Amendment S-3164 filed, adopted. S.J. 865. |
2013-04-17 | Senate | Amendment S-3162 filed, lost. S.J. 864. |
2013-04-17 | Senate | Amendment S-3163 filed, adopted. S.J. 864. |
2013-04-15 | Senate | Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 839. |
2013-04-15 | Senate | Introduced, placed on Appropriations calendar. S.J. 838. |