IA SF445 | 2009-2010 | 83rd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 17 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-01-07 - * * * * * END OF 2009 ACTIONS * * * * *
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 17 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-01-07 - * * * * * END OF 2009 ACTIONS * * * * *
Summary
A bill for an act relating to teacher compensation by requiring school corporations to incorporate teacher compensation into individual salary schedules and by eliminating the educational excellence program. (Formerly SF 314.) Effective 7-1-09.
Title
A bill for an act relating to teacher compensation by requiring school corporations to incorporate teacher compensation into individual salary schedules and by eliminating the educational excellence program. (Formerly SF 314.) Effective 7-1-09.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-01-07 | * * * * * END OF 2009 ACTIONS * * * * * | |
2009-04-17 | Signed by Governor. S.J. 1155. | |
2009-04-15 | Sent to Governor. S.J. 1118. | |
2009-04-15 | Reported correctly enrolled, signed by President and Speaker. S.J. 1118. | |
2009-04-06 | Message from House. S.J. 952. | |
2009-04-02 | Immediate message. H.J. 1143. | |
2009-04-02 | Passed House, ayes 56, nays 41. H.J. 1142. | |
2009-04-02 | Speaker ruled point not well taken. H.J. 1142. | |
2009-04-02 | Point of order raised Rule 32 invoked. H.J. 1142. | |
2009-04-02 | Amendments H-1366 and H-1367 withdrawn. H.J. 1141. | |
2009-04-02 | Amendment H-1332 lost. H.J. 1141. | |
2009-04-02 | Amendments H-1364 and H-1365 withdrawn. H.J. 1141. | |
2009-03-31 | Amendments H-1364, H-1365, H-1366, and H-1367 filed. H.J. 1095. | |
2009-03-30 | Amendment H-1332 filed. H.J. 1075. | |
2009-03-25 | Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 1037. | |
2009-03-24 | Subcommittee, Wendt, Dolecheck, and Steckman. H.J. 1027. | |
2009-03-20 | Read first time, referred to Education. H.J. 914. | |
2009-03-20 | Message from Senate. H.J. 913. | |
2009-03-19 | Immediate message. S.J. 748. | |
2009-03-19 | Passed Senate, ayes 32, nays 16. S.J. 748. | |
2009-03-19 | Fiscal note. SCS. | |
2009-03-16 | Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 642. | |
2009-03-16 | Introduced, placed on calendar. S.J. 641. |
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://coolice.legis.state.ia.us/Cool-ICE/default.asp?Category=BillInfo&Service=DspHistory&var=SF&key=0483B&ga=83 |