IA SF439 | 2015-2016 | 86th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on March 9 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-03-16 - Passed subcommittee.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 9 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-03-16 - Passed subcommittee.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act creating an Iowa ABLE savings plan trust, providing deductions and exclusions from the individual income tax and inheritance tax relating to the trust, and including retroactive and other applicability provisions. (Formerly SSB 1210; see SF 490.)
Title
A bill for an act creating an Iowa ABLE savings plan trust, providing deductions and exclusions from the individual income tax and inheritance tax relating to the trust, and including retroactive and other applicability provisions. (Formerly SSB 1210; see SF 490.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-16 | Senate | Passed subcommittee. |
2015-03-12 | Senate | Subcommittee, Bolkcom, Breitbach, and Jochum. S.J. 592. |
2015-03-11 | Senate | Referred to Ways & Means. S.J. 558. |
2015-03-09 | Senate | Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 485. |
2015-03-09 | Senate | Introduced, placed on calendar. S.J. 480. |
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=86&ba=SF439 |
Text | http://coolice.legis.iowa.gov/Legislation/86thGA/Bills/SenateFiles/Introduced/SF439.html |