IA SF438 | 2015-2016 | 86th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 24 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-24 - Signed by Governor. S.J. 932.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 24 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-24 - Signed by Governor. S.J. 932.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act requiring the racing and gaming commission to conduct a study on exchange wagering. (Formerly SSB 1256.) Effective 7-1-15.
Title
A bill for an act requiring the racing and gaming commission to conduct a study on exchange wagering. (Formerly SSB 1256.) Effective 7-1-15.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-04-14 - House - Passed House (Y: 81 N: 15 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-18 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 32 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-18 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 32 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-24 | Senate | Signed by Governor. S.J. 932. |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Sent to Governor. S.J. 906. |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Reported correctly enrolled, signed by President and Speaker. S.J. 906. |
2015-04-14 | Senate | Message from House. S.J. 854. |
2015-04-14 | House | Immediate message. H.J. 835. |
2015-04-14 | House | Passed House, ayes 81, nays 15. H.J. 833. |
2015-04-09 | House | Placed on calendar under unfinished business. H.J. 814. |
2015-04-03 | House | Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 754. |
2015-03-31 | House | Passed subcommittee. |
2015-03-26 | House | Subcommittee, Highfill, Hunter, and Vander Linden. H.J. 718. |
2015-03-19 | House | Read first time, referred to State Government. H.J. 660. |
2015-03-19 | House | Message from Senate. H.J. 640. |
2015-03-18 | Senate | Immediate message. S.J. 641. |
2015-03-18 | Senate | Passed Senate, ayes 32, nays 18. S.J. 641. |
2015-03-18 | Senate | Amendment S-3036 adopted. S.J. 640. |
2015-03-12 | Senate | Amendment S-3036 filed. S.J. 593. |
2015-03-09 | Senate | Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 493. |
2015-03-09 | Senate | Introduced, placed on calendar. S.J. 479. |