IA SF431 | 2017-2018 | 87th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 9 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-09 - Signed by Governor. S.J. 1135.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

A bill for an act relating to the siting of small wireless facilities. (Formerly SSB 1138.) Effective 7-1-17.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A bill for an act relating to the siting of small wireless facilities. (Formerly SSB 1138.) Effective 7-1-17.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-04-18 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-13 - House - Passed House (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-23 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 44 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
1969-12-31 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
1969-12-31 - House - Passed House (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
1969-12-31 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 44 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-09HouseSigned by Governor. S.J. 1135.
2017-04-25HouseSent to Governor. S.J. 1134.
2017-04-25HouseReported correctly enrolled, signed by President and Speaker. S.J. 1134.
2017-04-18HouseMessage from Senate. H.J. 1056.
2017-04-18SenateImmediate message. S.J. 1050.
2017-04-18SenatePassed Senate, ayes 50, nays 0. S.J. 1048.
2017-04-18SenateSenate concurred with S-3319. S.J. 1048.
2017-04-14SenateMessage from House, with amendment S-3319. S.J. 1022.
2017-04-13HouseImmediate message. H.J. 1007.
2017-04-13HousePassed House, ayes 93, nays 0. H.J. 1006.
2017-04-13HouseAmendment H-1337 filed, adopted. H.J. 1005.
2017-04-06HousePlaced on calendar under unfinished business. H.J. 905.
2017-03-30HouseCommittee report, recommending passage. H.J. 820.
2017-03-27HouseSubcommittee: Vander Linden, Hall and Mohr. H.J. 788.
2017-03-27HouseRead first time, referred to Commerce. H.J. 771.
2017-03-23HouseMessage from Senate. H.J. 761.
2017-03-23SenateImmediate message. S.J. 746.
2017-03-27SenateExplanation of vote. S.J. 788.
2017-03-23SenatePassed Senate, ayes 44, nays 3. S.J. 745.
2017-03-23SenateAmendment S-3220 adopted, as amended. S.J. 744.
2017-03-23SenateAmendment S-3230 filed, adopted. S.J. 744.
2017-03-21SenateAmendment S-3220 filed. S.J. 722.
2017-03-02SenateCommittee report, approving bill. S.J. 459.
2017-03-02SenateIntroduced, placed on calendar. S.J. 456.

Same As/Similar To

SSB1138 (Related) 2017-02-27 - Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage.
HF380 (Similar To) 2017-04-13 - Withdrawn. H.J. 1006.

Iowa State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=87&ba=SF431
Texthttp://coolice.legis.iowa.gov/Legislation/87thGA/Bills/SenateFiles/Introduced/SF431.html
Texthttp://coolice.legis.iowa.gov/Legislation/87thGA/Bills/SenateFiles/Reprinted/SF431.html
Texthttp://coolice.legis.iowa.gov/Legislation/87thGA/enrolled/SF431.html
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/pubs/sjweb/pdf/March%2023,%202017.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/pubs/hjweb/pdf/April%2013,%202017.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/pubs/sjweb/pdf/April%2018,%202017.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/SJNL/20170323_SJNL.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/HJNL/20170413_HJNL.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/SJNL/20170418_SJNL.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback