IA SF431 | 2011-2012 | 84th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 7 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-12-31 - END OF 2011 ACTIONS
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

A bill for an act relating to offenses involving agricultural operations, and providing penalties and remedies. (Formerly SF 341.)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A bill for an act relating to offenses involving agricultural operations, and providing penalties and remedies. (Formerly SF 341.)

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2011-12-31 END OF 2011 ACTIONS
2011-03-21 Referred to Agriculture. S.J. 727.
2011-03-16 Amendments S-3127, S-3128, S-3129, S-3130, and S-3131 filed. S.J. 715.
2011-03-16 Amendments S-3120, S-3121, S-3122, S-3123, S-3124, S-3125, and S-3126 filed. S.J. 714.
2011-03-09 Amendment S-3069 filed. S.J. 619.
2011-03-07 Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 510.
2011-03-07 Introduced, placed on calendar. S.J. 503.

Iowa State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback