IA SF430 | 2013-2014 | 85th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 20 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-12-31 - END OF 2013 ACTIONS
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 20 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-12-31 - END OF 2013 ACTIONS
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to appropriations to the department of cultural affairs, the economic development authority, the department of workforce development, the Iowa finance authority, and the public employment relations board, providing for other properly related matters, and including effective date and retroactive applicability provisions. (Formerly SSB 1246.) Item vetoed. Various effective dates; see section 46 of bill.
Title
A bill for an act relating to appropriations to the department of cultural affairs, the economic development authority, the department of workforce development, the Iowa finance authority, and the public employment relations board, providing for other properly related matters, and including effective date and retroactive applicability provisions. (Formerly SSB 1246.) Item vetoed. Various effective dates; see section 46 of bill.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-12-31 | House | END OF 2013 ACTIONS |
2013-06-20 | House | Item vetoed, signed by Governor. S.J. 1066. |
2013-05-23 | House | Sent to Governor. S.J. 1063. |
2013-05-23 | House | Reported correctly enrolled, signed by President and Speaker. S.J. 1063. |
2013-05-23 | House | Message from House. S.J. 1061. |
2013-05-23 | Senate | Pursuant to Rule 73.6, motion to reconsider failed. H.J. 1112. |
2013-05-15 | Senate | Motion filed to reconsider vote on the bill by Upmeyer. H.J. 1059. |
2013-05-17 | Senate | Explanation of vote. H.J. 1079. |
2013-05-15 | Senate | Passed House, ayes 89, nays 8. H.J. 1057. |
2013-05-15 | Senate | Conference committee report adopted. H.J. 1057. |
2013-05-15 | Senate | Conference committee report filed. H.J. 1056. |
2013-05-15 | Senate | Message from Senate. H.J. 1052. |
2013-05-15 | House | Immediate message. S.J. 1004. |
2013-05-15 | House | Passed Senate, ayes 27, nays 18. S.J. 1004. |
2013-05-15 | House | Conference committee report adopted. S.J. 1004. |
2013-05-15 | House | Conference committee report filed. S.J. 1003. |
2013-04-18 | House | Message from Senate. H.J. 878. |
2013-04-17 | Senate | Immediate message. S.J. 870. |
2013-04-17 | Senate | Senate conference committee appointed, Dotzler, Boettger, Hart, Schneider, and Seng. S.J. 870. |
2013-04-17 | Senate | Message from House. S.J. 869. |
2013-04-17 | House | Immediate message. H.J. 875. |
2013-04-17 | House | House conference committee appointed Deyoe, Hanusa, Kaufmann, Running-Marquardt, and Kressig. H.J. 874. |
2013-04-17 | House | House insisted. H.J. 874. |
2013-04-17 | House | Message from Senate. H.J. 874. |
2013-04-17 | Senate | Immediate message. S.J. 866. |
2013-04-17 | Senate | Senate refused to concur with S-3161. S.J. 863. |
2013-04-16 | Senate | Message from House, with amendment S-3161. S.J. 855. |
2013-04-16 | House | Immediate message. H.J. 859. |
2013-04-16 | House | Passed House, ayes 52, nays 46. H.J. 858. |
2013-04-16 | House | Committee amendment H-1273 adopted. H.J. 857. |
2013-04-16 | House | Amendment H-1302 to committee amendment H-1273 filed, lost. H.J. 857. |
2013-04-16 | House | Amendment H-1289 to committee amendment H-1273 withdrawn. H.J. 857. |
2013-04-16 | House | Amendment H-1298 to committee amendment H-1273 lost. H.J. 857. |
2013-04-16 | House | Deferred, retained on calendar. H.J. 854. |
2013-04-16 | House | Amendment H-1301 to committee amendment H-1273 lost. H.J. 854. |
2013-04-16 | House | Amendment H-1301 to committee amendment H-1273 filed. H.J. 853. |
2013-04-16 | House | Amendment H-1294 to committee amendment H-1273 lost. H.J. 853. |
2013-04-16 | House | Amendment H-1292 to committee amendment H-1273 lost. H.J. 852. |
2013-04-16 | House | Amendment H-1293 to committee amendment H-1273 lost. H.J. 851. |
2013-04-16 | House | Amendment H-1295 to committee amendment H-1273 lost. H.J. 850. |
2013-04-16 | House | Ruled not germane amendment H-1299 to committee amendment H-1273. H.J. 849. |
2013-04-16 | House | Point of order raised amendment H-1299 not germane to committee amendment H-1273. H.J. 849. |
2013-04-16 | House | Amendment H-1299 to committee amendment H-1273 filed. H.J. 849. |
2013-04-16 | House | Motion to suspend rules failed. H.J. 849. |
2013-04-16 | House | Motion to suspend rules to consider amendment H-1288 to committee amendment H-1273. H.J. 848. |
2013-04-16 | House | Ruled not germane amendment H-1288 to committee amendment H-1273. H.J. 848. |
2013-04-16 | House | Point of order raised amendment H-1288 not germane to committee amendment H-1273. H.J. 848. |
2013-04-15 | House | Amendments H-1289, H-1292, H-1293, H-1294, H-1295, and H-1298 filed. H.J. 840. |
2013-04-11 | House | Amendment H-1288 filed. H.J. 835. |
2013-04-09 | House | Committee amendment H-1273 filed. H.J. 815. |
2013-04-09 | House | Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. H.J. 813. |
2013-04-04 | House | Subcommittee, Deyoe, Lofgren, and Running-Marquardt. H.J. 756. |
2013-04-04 | House | Read first time, referred to Appropriations. H.J. 753. |
2013-04-04 | House | Message from Senate. H.J. 753. |
2013-04-03 | Senate | Immediate message. S.J. 727. |
2013-04-03 | Senate | Passed Senate, ayes 26, nays 24. S.J. 724. |
2013-04-03 | Senate | Amendment S-3110 adopted. S.J. 724. |
2013-04-02 | Senate | Amendment S-3110 filed. S.J. 718. |
2013-03-27 | Senate | Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 687. |
2013-03-27 | Senate | Introduced, placed on Appropriations calendar. S.J. 686. |