IA SF422 | 2009-2010 | 83rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on March 16 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-01-07 - * * * * * END OF 2009 ACTIONS * * * * *
Status: Introduced on March 16 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-01-07 - * * * * * END OF 2009 ACTIONS * * * * *
Summary
A bill for an act relating to a quality assurance assessment program, nursing facility reimbursements, and providing monetary penalties, contingencies, and effective dates. (Formerly SSB 1179, See SF 476.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to a quality assurance assessment program, nursing facility reimbursements, and providing monetary penalties, contingencies, and effective dates. (Formerly SSB 1179, See SF 476.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-01-07 | * * * * * END OF 2009 ACTIONS * * * * * | |
2009-03-24 | Fiscal note. SCS. | |
2009-03-17 | Subcommittee, Bolkcom, Dotzler, and Feenstra. S.J. 675. | |
2009-03-17 | Referred to Ways & Means. S.J. 654. | |
2009-03-16 | Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 643. | |
2009-03-16 | Introduced, placed on calendar. S.J. 637. |
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://coolice.legis.state.ia.us/Cool-ICE/default.asp?Category=BillInfo&Service=DspHistory&var=SF&key=0459B&ga=83 |