IA SF416 | 2017-2018 | 87th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on March 2 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-04-11 - Withdrawn. S.J. 969.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 2 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-04-11 - Withdrawn. S.J. 969.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to the authority of cities to regulate and restrict the occupancy of residential rental property. (Formerly SSB 1009.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to the authority of cities to regulate and restrict the occupancy of residential rental property. (Formerly SSB 1009.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-11 | Senate | Withdrawn. S.J. 969. |
2017-04-11 | Senate | HF 134 substituted. S.J. 958. |
2017-04-11 | Senate | Amendment S-3089 withdrawn. S.J. 958. |
2017-03-31 | Senate | Placed on calendar under unfinished business. S.J. 838. |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Attached to companion HF 134. S.J. 647. |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Amendment S-3089 filed. S.J. 515. |
2017-03-02 | Senate | Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 462. |
2017-03-02 | Senate | Introduced, placed on calendar. S.J. 454. |
Same As/Similar To
SSB1009 (Related) 2017-02-01 - Subcommittee recommends passage.
HSB3 (Related) 2017-01-25 - Passed subcommittee.
HF134 (Similar To) 2017-04-21 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 1142.
HSB3 (Related) 2017-01-25 - Passed subcommittee.
HF134 (Similar To) 2017-04-21 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 1142.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=87&ba=SF416 |
Text | http://coolice.legis.iowa.gov/Legislation/87thGA/Bills/SenateFiles/Introduced/SF416.html |