IA SF412 | 2019-2020 | 88th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 1 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-01 - Signed by Governor. S.J. 1195.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 1 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-01 - Signed by Governor. S.J. 1195.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to post-loss assignment of rights to residential contractors for repair or services performed on residential real estate covered by property and casualty insurance, and making penalties applicable. (Formerly SSB 1161.) Effective 7-1-19.
Title
A bill for an act relating to post-loss assignment of rights to residential contractors for repair or services performed on residential real estate covered by property and casualty insurance, and making penalties applicable. (Formerly SSB 1161.) Effective 7-1-19.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-11 - House - Passed House (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-18 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-18 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-01 | Senate | Signed by Governor. S.J. 1195. |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Reported correctly enrolled, signed by President and Speaker, and sent to Governor. S.J. 1193. |
2019-04-15 | Senate | Message from House. S.J. 941. |
2019-04-11 | House | Immediate message. H.J. 843. |
2019-04-11 | House | Passed House, yeas 100 nays none. H.J. 813. |
2019-04-11 | House | Substituted for HF 417. H.J. 813. |
2019-03-19 | House | Read first time, passed on file. H.J. 569. |
2019-03-19 | House | Message from Senate. H.J. 568. |
2019-03-18 | Senate | Immediate message. S.J. 647. |
2019-03-18 | Senate | Passed Senate, yeas 48, nays 0. S.J. 647. |
2019-02-28 | Senate | Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 434. |
2019-02-28 | Senate | Introduced, placed on calendar. S.J. 425. |
Same As/Similar To
HSB33 (Related) 2019-02-13 - Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. H.J. 290.
SSB1161 (Related) 2019-02-21 - Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage.
HF417 (Similar To) 2019-04-11 - Withdrawn. H.J. 843.
SSB1161 (Related) 2019-02-21 - Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage.
HF417 (Similar To) 2019-04-11 - Withdrawn. H.J. 843.