IA SF41 | 2023-2024 | 90th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-02-21 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 352. S.J. 374.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

A bill for an act relating to budgets of local emergency management agencies and including applicability provisions.(See SF 352, SF 570, SF 2426.)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A bill for an act relating to budgets of local emergency management agencies and including applicability provisions.(See SF 352, SF 570, SF 2426.)

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2023-02-21SenateCommittee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 352. S.J. 374.
2023-01-24SenateSubcommittee recommends passage. [].
2023-01-23SenateSubcommittee Meeting: 01/24/2023 1:30PM Room G15.
2023-01-12SenateSubcommittee: Klimesh, Quirmbach, and Westrich. S.J. 119.
2023-01-11SenateIntroduced, referred to Local Government. S.J. 96.

Same As/Similar To

HF126 (Similar To) 2023-03-02 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 546.
SF352 (Similar To) 2023-04-20 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 570. S.J. 918.
HF546 (Similar To) 2023-04-10 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 705.
HF705 (Similar To) 2023-05-04 - Rereferred to Local Government. H.J. 1030.
SF570 (Similar To) 2024-04-04 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2426. S.J. 750.
SF2426 (Similar To) 2024-04-04 - Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 750.

Iowa State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback