IA SF406 | 2017-2018 | 87th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 20 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-20 - Signed by Governor. S.J. 1113.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 20 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-20 - Signed by Governor. S.J. 1113.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act exempting motor vehicles carrying an implement of husbandry from certain permit requirements. (Formerly SF 211.) Effective 7-1-17.
Title
A bill for an act exempting motor vehicles carrying an implement of husbandry from certain permit requirements. (Formerly SF 211.) Effective 7-1-17.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-06 - House - Passed House (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-21 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
1969-12-31 - House - Passed House (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
1969-12-31 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-21 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
1969-12-31 - House - Passed House (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
1969-12-31 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-20 | Senate | Signed by Governor. S.J. 1113. |
2017-04-18 | Senate | Sent to Governor. S.J. 1061. |
2017-04-18 | Senate | Reported correctly enrolled, signed by President and Speaker. S.J. 1061. |
2017-04-07 | Senate | Message from House. S.J. 929. |
2017-04-06 | House | Immediate message. H.J. 918. |
2017-04-06 | House | Passed House, ayes 94, nays 0. H.J. 912. |
2017-04-06 | House | Placed on calendar under unfinished business. H.J. 905. |
2017-03-29 | House | Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 810. |
2017-03-22 | House | Subcommittee: Best, Huseman and Jacoby. H.J. 756. |
2017-03-21 | House | Read first time, referred to Transportation. H.J. 707. |
2017-03-21 | House | Message from Senate. H.J. 705. |
2017-03-21 | Senate | Immediate message. S.J. 692. |
2017-03-27 | Senate | Explanation of vote. S.J. 787. |
2017-03-21 | Senate | Passed Senate, ayes 49, nays 0. S.J. 691. |
2017-03-02 | Senate | Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 466. |
2017-03-02 | Senate | Introduced, placed on calendar. S.J. 452. |
Same As/Similar To
SF211 (Similar To) 2018-03-29 - NOBA: Final