IA SF406 | 2013-2014 | 85th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 20 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-12-31 - END OF 2013 ACTIONS
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 20 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-12-31 - END OF 2013 ACTIONS
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to involuntary commitments for persons with substance-related disorders, mental illness, and intellectual disabilities, and providing for the creation of a mental health advocate division in the department of inspections and appeals and including effective date provisions. (Formerly SSB 1192.) Item vetoed. Various effective dates; see section 35 of bill.
Title
A bill for an act relating to involuntary commitments for persons with substance-related disorders, mental illness, and intellectual disabilities, and providing for the creation of a mental health advocate division in the department of inspections and appeals and including effective date provisions. (Formerly SSB 1192.) Item vetoed. Various effective dates; see section 35 of bill.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-12-31 | House | END OF 2013 ACTIONS |
2013-06-20 | House | Item vetoed, signed by Governor. S.J. 1065. |
2013-05-23 | House | Sent to Governor. S.J. 1063. |
2013-05-23 | House | Reported correctly enrolled, signed by President and Speaker. S.J. 1063. |
2013-05-16 | House | Message from Senate. H.J. 1065. |
2013-05-16 | Senate | Immediate message. S.J. 1016. |
2013-05-16 | Senate | Passed Senate, ayes 47, nays none. S.J. 1012. |
2013-05-16 | Senate | Senate concurred with S-3252. S.J. 1012. |
2013-05-15 | Senate | Message from House, with amendment S-3252. S.J. 1005. |
2013-05-15 | House | Immediate message. H.J. 1051. |
2013-05-16 | House | Explanation of vote. H.J. 1074. |
2013-05-15 | House | Passed House, ayes 88, nays 8. H.J. 1048. |
2013-05-15 | House | Amendments H-1275, H-1331, and H-1335 withdrawn. H.J. 1048. |
2013-05-15 | House | Amendment H-1449 adopted. H.J. 1048. |
2013-05-15 | House | Amendment H-1450 to amendment H-1449 lost. H.J. 1048. |
2013-05-15 | House | Amendment H-1450 to amendment H-1449 filed. H.J. 1047. |
2013-05-15 | House | Amendment H-1449 filed. H.J. 1047. |
2013-05-15 | House | Amendment H-1284 out of order. H.J. 1047. |
2013-05-15 | House | Amendment H-1269 withdrawn. H.J. 1047. |
2013-05-15 | House | Amendments H-1372 and H-1442 out of order. H.J. 1047. |
2013-05-15 | House | Committee amendment H-1251 withdrawn. H.J. 1047. |
2013-05-07 | House | Amendment H-1442 filed. H.J. 1031. |
2013-04-29 | House | Amendment H-1372 filed. H.J. 952. |
2013-04-23 | House | Amendment H-1335 filed. H.J. 924. |
2013-04-22 | House | Amendment H-1331 filed. H.J. 886. |
2013-04-12 | House | Placed on calendar under unfinished business. H.J. 836. |
2013-04-10 | House | Amendment H-1284 filed. H.J. 828. |
2013-04-09 | House | Fiscal note. HCS. |
2013-04-09 | House | Amendment H-1275 filed. H.J. 815. |
2013-04-09 | House | Amendment H-1269 filed. H.J. 814. |
2013-04-04 | House | Committee amendment H-1251 filed. H.J. 758. |
2013-04-04 | House | Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. H.J. 757. |
2013-04-01 | House | Subcommittee, Baltimore, Heaton, and M. Smith. H.J. 723. |
2013-03-25 | House | Read first time, referred to Judiciary. H.J. 670. |
2013-03-25 | House | Message from Senate. H.J. 669. |
2013-03-25 | Senate | Immediate message. S.J. 632. |
2013-03-25 | Senate | Passed Senate, ayes 48, nays none. S.J. 630. |
2013-03-25 | Senate | Fiscal note. SCS. |
2013-03-11 | Senate | Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 478. |
2013-03-11 | Senate | Introduced, placed on calendar. S.J. 473. |