IA SF406 | 2011-2012 | 84th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 19 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-12-31 - END OF 2011 ACTIONS
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 19 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-12-31 - END OF 2011 ACTIONS
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to various matters under the purview of the insurance division of the department of commerce and including effective date provisions. (Formerly SSB 1089.) Various effective dates; see section 49 of bill.
Title
A bill for an act relating to various matters under the purview of the insurance division of the department of commerce and including effective date provisions. (Formerly SSB 1089.) Various effective dates; see section 49 of bill.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-12-31 | END OF 2011 ACTIONS | |
2011-04-19 | Signed by Governor. S.J. 1024. | |
2011-04-18 | Sent to Governor. S.J. 1012. | |
2011-04-18 | Reported correctly enrolled, signed by President and Speaker. S.J. 1012. | |
2011-04-07 | Message from House. S.J. 929. | |
2011-04-06 | Immediate message. H.J. 939. | |
2011-04-06 | Passed House, ayes 60, nays 35. H.J. 938. | |
2011-04-06 | Amendment H-1473 lost. H.J. 938. | |
2011-04-06 | Amendments H-1484, H-1483, H-1501, and H-1452 withdrawn. H.J. 937. | |
2011-04-06 | Amendment H-1453 as amended, lost. H.J. 937. | |
2011-04-06 | Amendment H-1553 withdrawn. H.J. 936. | |
2011-04-06 | Amendment H-1555 adopted. H.J. 936. | |
2011-04-06 | Deferred, retained on calendar. H.J. 928. | |
2011-04-06 | Substituted for HF 482. H.J. 928. | |
2011-04-05 | Amendments H-1553 and H-1555 filed. H.J. 921. | |
2011-03-31 | Amendment H-1501 filed. H.J. 869. | |
2011-03-29 | Amendments H-1483 and H-1484 filed. H.J. 839. | |
2011-03-28 | Amendment H-1473 filed. H.J. 828. | |
2011-03-23 | Amendments H-1452 and H-1453 filed. H.J. 798. | |
2011-03-23 | Read first time, passed on file. H.J. 781. | |
2011-03-23 | Message from Senate. H.J. 776. | |
2011-03-22 | Immediate message. S.J. 760. | |
2011-03-22 | Passed Senate, ayes 48, nays none. S.J. 758. | |
2011-03-22 | Amendment S-3159 filed, adopted. S.J. 758. | |
2011-03-22 | Amendment S-3150 filed, adopted. S.J. 758. | |
2011-03-22 | Amendment S-3142 withdrawn. S.J. 758. | |
2011-03-21 | Amendment S-3142 filed. S.J. 748. | |
2011-03-03 | Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 476. | |
2011-03-03 | Introduced, placed on calendar. S.J. 471. |