IA SF40 | 2021-2022 | 89th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-01-26 - Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage.
Pending: Senate Veterans Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-01-26 - Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage.
Pending: Senate Veterans Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to hunting and fishing privileges for certain disabled veterans.
Title
A bill for an act relating to hunting and fishing privileges for certain disabled veterans.
Sponsors
Sen. Brad Zaun [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-26 | Senate | Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage. |
2021-01-21 | Senate | Subcommittee Meeting: 01/26/2021 1:00PM 217 Conference Room. |
2021-01-13 | Senate | Subcommittee: Reichman, Edler, and Mathis. S.J. 97. |
2021-01-11 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Veterans Affairs. S.J. 27. |
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=89&ba=SF40 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/89/attachments/SF40.html |