IA SF4 | 2017-2018 | 87th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-08 - NOBA: Final
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-08 - NOBA: Final
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to the treatment of adoptive parent employees and making penalties applicable.
Title
A bill for an act relating to the treatment of adoptive parent employees and making penalties applicable.
Sponsors
Sen. Matt McCoy [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-08 | Senate | NOBA: Final |
2018-02-20 | Senate | NOBA: House Floor |
2018-02-19 | Senate | NOBA: House Full Approps |
2017-05-11 | Senate | NOBA: Graybook |
2017-04-21 | Senate | NOBA: Graybook |
2017-04-11 | Senate | NOBA: Final |
2017-04-11 | Senate | NOBA: Final |
2017-04-11 | Senate | NOBA: House Floor |
2017-04-11 | Senate | NOBA: House Floor |
2017-04-10 | Senate | NOBA: Senate Floor |
2017-04-10 | Senate | NOBA: Senate Floor |
2017-03-29 | Senate | NOBA: Senate Full Approps |
2017-01-18 | Senate | Subcommittee: Schultz, Guth, and Taylor. S.J. 98. |
2017-01-09 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Labor and Business Relations. S.J. 44. |
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=87&ba=SF4 |
Text | http://coolice.legis.iowa.gov/Legislation/87thGA/Bills/SenateFiles/Introduced/SF4.html |