IA SF4 | 2011-2012 | 84th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-12-31 - END OF 2011 ACTIONS
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 10 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-12-31 - END OF 2011 ACTIONS
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act providing volunteer fire fighters and emergency medical services personnel with an individual income tax credit and including effective date and applicability provisions.
Title
A bill for an act providing volunteer fire fighters and emergency medical services personnel with an individual income tax credit and including effective date and applicability provisions.
Sponsors
Sen. Tom Hancock [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-12-31 | END OF 2011 ACTIONS | |
2011-03-14 | Fiscal note. SCS. | |
2011-01-13 | Subcommittee, Dotzler, Black, and Smith. S.J. 71. | |
2011-01-10 | Introduced, referred to Ways & Means. S.J. 36. |