IA SF396 | 2011-2012 | 84th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 7 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-12-31 - END OF 2011 ACTIONS
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 7 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-12-31 - END OF 2011 ACTIONS
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to the regulation of indemnification provisions in construction contracts. (Formerly SSB 1172.) Effective 7-1-11.
Title
A bill for an act relating to the regulation of indemnification provisions in construction contracts. (Formerly SSB 1172.) Effective 7-1-11.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-12-31 | END OF 2011 ACTIONS | |
2011-04-07 | Signed by Governor. S.J. 939. | |
2011-04-04 | Sent to Governor. S.J. 878. | |
2011-04-04 | Reported correctly enrolled, signed by President and Speaker. S.J. 878. | |
2011-03-30 | Message from House. S.J. 841. | |
2011-03-30 | Immediate message. H.J. 848. | |
2011-03-30 | Passed House, ayes 84, nays 12. H.J. 843. | |
2011-03-30 | Substituted for HF 483. H.J. 843. | |
2011-03-28 | Passed on file. H.J. 824. | |
2011-03-25 | Read first time, referred to Commerce. H.J. 810. | |
2011-03-22 | Message from Senate. H.J. 770. | |
2011-03-22 | Immediate message. S.J. 757. | |
2011-03-22 | Passed Senate, ayes 47, nays 1. S.J. 757. | |
2011-03-22 | Amendment S-3157 filed, adopted. S.J. 756. | |
2011-03-22 | Amendment S-3133 withdrawn. S.J. 756. | |
2011-03-17 | Amendment S-3133 filed. S.J. 724. | |
2011-03-02 | Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 459. | |
2011-03-02 | Introduced, placed on calendar. S.J. 454. |