IA SF393 | 2011-2012 | 84th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 12 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-12-31 - END OF 2011 ACTIONS
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 12 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-12-31 - END OF 2011 ACTIONS
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to drainage and levee districts by providing for the delivery of a written communication to state and local government. (Formerly SSB 1124.) Effective 7-1-11.
Title
A bill for an act relating to drainage and levee districts by providing for the delivery of a written communication to state and local government. (Formerly SSB 1124.) Effective 7-1-11.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-12-31 | END OF 2011 ACTIONS | |
2011-04-12 | Signed by Governor. S.J. 994. | |
2011-04-11 | Sent to Governor. S.J. 956. | |
2011-04-11 | Reported correctly enrolled, signed by President and Speaker. S.J. 956. | |
2011-04-05 | Message from House. S.J. 880. | |
2011-04-04 | Immediate message. H.J. 901. | |
2011-04-04 | Passed House, ayes 98, nays none. H.J. 897. | |
2011-03-18 | Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 722. | |
2011-03-09 | Subcommittee, J. Smith, Iverson, and Kajtazovic. H.J. 645. | |
2011-03-09 | Read first time, referred to Local Government. H.J. 587. | |
2011-03-08 | Message from Senate. H.J. 563. | |
2011-03-08 | Immediate message. S.J. 528. | |
2011-03-08 | Passed Senate, ayes 49, nays none. S.J. 525. | |
2011-03-08 | Amendment S-3050 filed, adopted. S.J. 525. | |
2011-03-02 | Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 461. | |
2011-03-02 | Introduced, placed on calendar. S.J. 454. |