IA SF393 | 2009-2010 | 83rd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 23 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-23 - Signed by Governor. S.J. 1072.
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 23 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-23 - Signed by Governor. S.J. 1072.
Summary
A bill for an act relating to access to obscene materials and child in need of assistance proceedings and child abuse reporting. (Formerly SF 271.) Effective 7-1-10.
Title
A bill for an act relating to access to obscene materials and child in need of assistance proceedings and child abuse reporting. (Formerly SF 271.) Effective 7-1-10.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-23 | Signed by Governor. S.J. 1072. | |
2010-03-30 | Sent to Governor. S.J. 1070. | |
2010-03-30 | Reported correctly enrolled, signed by President and Speaker. S.J. 1070. | |
2010-03-11 | Message from House. S.J. 807. | |
2010-03-11 | Immediate message. H.J. 947. | |
2010-03-11 | Passed House, ayes 98, nays none. H.J. 942. | |
2010-02-02 | Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 236. | |
2010-01-07 | * * * * * END OF 2009 ACTIONS * * * * * | |
2009-04-25 | Referred to Human Resources. H.J. 2127. | |
2009-03-24 | Read first time, passed on file. H.J. 994. | |
2009-03-23 | Message from Senate. H.J. 965. | |
2009-03-23 | Immediate message. S.J. 795. | |
2009-03-23 | Passed Senate, ayes 48, nays 1. S.J. 790. | |
2009-03-23 | Amendment S-3106 adopted. S.J. 790. | |
2009-03-18 | Amendment S-3106 filed. S.J. 732. | |
2009-03-10 | Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 596. | |
2009-03-10 | Introduced, placed on calendar. S.J. 592. |
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://coolice.legis.state.ia.us/Cool-ICE/default.asp?Category=BillInfo&Service=DspHistory&var=SF&key=0430B&ga=83 |