IA SF391 | 2015-2016 | 86th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 17 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-14 - Amendment H-1223 filed. H.J. 844.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 17 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-14 - Amendment H-1223 filed. H.J. 844.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to the use of electronic communication devices while driving as a primary offense. (Formerly SSB 1041.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to the use of electronic communication devices while driving as a primary offense. (Formerly SSB 1041.)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-03-17 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 44 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-14 | House | Amendment H-1223 filed. H.J. 844. |
2015-04-09 | House | Referred to Transportation. H.J. 814. |
2015-04-07 | House | Amendments H-1190 and H-1191 filed. H.J. 789. |
2015-04-07 | House | Committee amendment H-1192 filed. H.J. 789. |
2015-04-07 | House | Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. H.J. 788. |
2015-03-26 | House | Passed subcommittee. |
2015-03-23 | House | Subcommittee, Worthan, Best, and Finkenauer. H.J. 667. |
2015-03-17 | House | Read first time, referred to Transportation. H.J. 620. |
2015-03-17 | House | Message from Senate. H.J. 616. |
2015-03-17 | Senate | Immediate message. S.J. 617. |
2015-03-17 | Senate | Passed Senate, ayes 44, nays 6. S.J. 614. |
2015-03-04 | Senate | Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 448. |
2015-03-04 | Senate | Introduced, placed on calendar. S.J. 440. |