IA SF390 | 2013-2014 | 85th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-12-31 - END OF 2013 ACTIONS
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-12-31 - END OF 2013 ACTIONS
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to certain title abstracts to property with private sewage disposal systems and providing effective date and retroactive applicability provisions. (Formerly SSB 1219.) Effective 4-5-13.
Title
A bill for an act relating to certain title abstracts to property with private sewage disposal systems and providing effective date and retroactive applicability provisions. (Formerly SSB 1219.) Effective 4-5-13.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-12-31 | Senate | END OF 2013 ACTIONS |
2013-04-08 | Senate | Signed by Governor. S.J. 778. |
2013-04-02 | Senate | Sent to Governor. S.J. 718. |
2013-04-02 | Senate | Reported correctly enrolled, signed by President and Speaker. S.J. 718. |
2013-03-25 | Senate | Message from House. S.J. 646. |
2013-03-25 | House | Immediate message. H.J. 669. |
2013-03-25 | House | Passed House, ayes 97, nays none. H.J. 662. |
2013-03-25 | House | Substituted for HF 491. H.J. 662. |
2013-03-19 | House | Read first time, passed on file. H.J. 620. |
2013-03-19 | House | Message from Senate. H.J. 595. |
2013-03-18 | Senate | Immediate message. S.J. 567. |
2013-03-18 | Senate | Passed Senate, ayes 48, nays none. S.J. 562. |
2013-03-11 | Senate | Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 447. |
2013-03-11 | Senate | Introduced, placed on calendar. S.J. 437. |