IA SF39 | 2019-2020 | 88th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 15 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-05 - Subcommittee reassigned: Chapman, Bolkcom, and Edler. S.J. 217.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 15 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-05 - Subcommittee reassigned: Chapman, Bolkcom, and Edler. S.J. 217.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act reducing the state inheritance tax rates and providing for the future repeal of the state inheritance tax and state qualified use inheritance tax.
Title
A bill for an act reducing the state inheritance tax rates and providing for the future repeal of the state inheritance tax and state qualified use inheritance tax.
Sponsors
Sen. Brad Zaun [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-05 | Senate | Subcommittee reassigned: Chapman, Bolkcom, and Edler. S.J. 217. |
2019-02-01 | Senate | Fiscal note. |
2019-01-17 | Senate | Subcommittee: Feenstra, Bolkcom, and Chapman. S.J. 125. |
2019-01-15 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Ways and Means. S.J. 86. |
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=88&ba=SF39 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/88/attachments/SF39.html |