IA SF387 | 2011-2012 | 84th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on March 2 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-12-31 - END OF 2011 ACTIONS
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 2 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-12-31 - END OF 2011 ACTIONS
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act providing for a manufacturing jobs program and including retroactive applicability provisions. (Formerly SF 145.)
Title
A bill for an act providing for a manufacturing jobs program and including retroactive applicability provisions. (Formerly SF 145.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-12-31 | END OF 2011 ACTIONS | |
2011-03-08 | Subcommittee, Bolkcom, Bartz, and Dotzler. S.J. 554. | |
2011-03-03 | Referred to Ways & Means. S.J. 466. | |
2011-03-02 | Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 459. | |
2011-03-02 | Introduced, placed on calendar. S.J. 453. |